CLOUGH v. BROCK SERVICES LLC
Plaintiff: MATTHEW CLOUGH
Defendant: BROCK SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00050
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay : This docket entry was modified to add MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Stay as they were included within the motion. (sfw)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration with Incorporated Memorandum of Law, MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay by BROCK SERVICES LLC Responses due by 4/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amy Beck, #2 Attachment 1 Arbitration Agreement - Dispute Resolution Policy, #3 Attachment 2 Section 8.02 of Employee Handbook, #4 Attachment 3 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Brock Handbook, #5 Proposed Order)(CATERINE, MELINDA). Added MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay on 3/29/2019 (sfw).
March 26, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for BROCK SERVICES LLC Per Order #9: Answer due by 3/29/2019. (sfw)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BROCK SERVICES LLC. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by BROCK SERVICES LLC Responses due by 4/15/2019. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
March 19, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement from BROCK SERVICES LLC due by 3/26/2019. (sfw)
March 11, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for BROCK SERVICES LLC : Answer due by 3/26/2019. (sfw)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by BROCK SERVICES LLC Responses due by 4/1/2019. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
February 25, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for Brock Services, LLC : Answer due by 3/12/2019. (mtm)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (mtm)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by BROCK SERVICES LLC Responses due by 3/18/2019. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
February 25, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint, for BROCK SERVICES LLC : Answer due by 2/26/2019. (sfw)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MATTHEW CLOUGH. BROCK SERVICES LLC served on 2/5/2019. (CLIFFORD, JAMES)
January 31, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1968613.), filed by MATTHEW CLOUGH.(CLIFFORD, JAMES)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BROCK SERVICES LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BROCK SERVICES LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MATTHEW CLOUGH. (Service of Process Deadline 4/29/2019) Fee due by 1/31/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLOUGH v. BROCK SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW CLOUGH
Represented By: ANDREW P. COTTER
Represented By: JAMES A. CLIFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROCK SERVICES LLC
Represented By: MELINDA J. CATERINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?