BROWN et al v. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON

Plaintiff: JUDI BROWN
Defendant: LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Case Number: 2:2019cv00078
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Set Deadlines: Attorney ALEXANDER B. FEINBERG and Attorney KATHARINE A. WEBER shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 4/16/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jib)
April 5, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexander B. Feinberg and Katharine A. Weber filed by NOLAN L. REICHL on behalf of LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number 0100-2001239.) (Attachments: #1 Weber PHV Certification)(REICHL, NOLAN)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED ORDER granting in part #15 Joint Objection to Scheduling Order. Following a telephonic hearing held at my request with Attorneys Frenette, Parker, and Reichl, the joint objection is granted in part, to the extent that while I declined to extend pretrial deadlines by the six months requested, I extended them by 30 days without prejudice to further revision provided that the parties pursue discovery diligently (the parties have exchanged initial disclosures, the defendant has served discovery, and I directed the plaintiff to serve her discovery by April 16, 2019). Accordingly, the court's scheduling order, ECF No. 11, is amended as follows: the deadlines for any amendment of pleadings and joinder of parties and for the plaintiff to designate her expert witnesses are extended to June 21, 2019; the defendant shall designate its expert witnesses by July 26, 2019; discovery shall be completed by August 23, 2019; the plaintiff's written demand and the defendant's written response shall be exchanged by August 9 and 23, 2019, respectively; any Local Rule 56(h) notice shall be filed by August 30, 2019; the dispositive/Daubert/Kumho motions deadline is extended to September 13, 2019; and the case shall remain trial-ready on October 7, 2019, to allow for the possibility that no Local Rule 56(h) notice is filed by the new August 30 deadline. Attorney Reichl requested that the five-deposition limit exclude experts, but Attorney Frenette objected, and, without prejudice, I took no action at hearing. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
April 3, 2019 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines - Per Order #20: Discovery due by 8/23/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 8/30/2029. Motions due by 9/13/2019. Ready for Trial shall remain 10/7/2019. (slg)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part #15 Joint Objection to Scheduling Order. Following a telephonic hearing held at my request with Attorneys Frenette, Parker, and Reichl, the joint objection is granted in part, to the extent that while I declined to extend pretrial deadlines by the six months requested, I extended them by 30 days without prejudice to further revision provided that the parties pursue discovery diligently (the parties have exchanged initial disclosures, the defendant has served discovery, and I directed the plaintiff to serve her discovery by April 16, 2019). Accordingly, the court's scheduling order, ECF No. 11, is amended as follows: the deadlines for any amendment of pleadings and joinder of parties and for the plaintiff to designate her expert witnesses are extended to June 21, 2019; the defendant shall designate its expert witnesses by July 26, 2019; discovery shall be completed by August 23, 2019; the plaintiff's written demand and the defendant's written response shall be exchanged by August 9 and 23, 2019, respectively; any Local Rule 56(h) notice shall be filed by August 30, 2019; the dispositive/Daubert/Kumho motions deadline is extended to September 13, 2019; and the case shall remain trial-ready on October 7, 2019, to allow for the possibility that no Local Rule 56(h) notice is filed by the new August 30 deadline. Attorney Reichl requested that the five-deposition limit exclude experts, but Attorney Frenette objected, and, without prejudice, I took no action at hearing since the issue was not raised in the parties' Joint Objection. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER - granting #17 Motion for Confidentiality Order. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III: Hearing held on 4/2/2019 re: ECF No. 15; docket order to follow. (Court Reporter: FTR) (RICH III, JOHN)
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by JUDI BROWN(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Tait T Brown), JUDI BROWN Responses due by 4/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Confidentiality Order)(FRENETTE, MARC)
March 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #15 Joint OBJECTION to #11 Scheduling Order: Telephone Conference set for 4/2/2019 11:00 AM with MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. Counsel shall coordinate the call and contact chambers once both sides are on the line. (nrg)
March 25, 2019 Case Reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN no longer assigned to the case. (mnw)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 Joint OBJECTION to #11 Scheduling Order, filed by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. Responses due by 4/15/2019. (REICHL, NOLAN)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge John H. Rich III by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (REICHL, NOLAN)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEX S PARKER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (PARKER, ALEX)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 Reply to #10 Counterclaim by JUDI BROWN (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Tait T Brown) and JUDI BROWN.(FRENETTE, MARC) Modified on 3/12/2019 to clean up text (slg).
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/24/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/31/2019. Motions due by 8/14/2019. Ready for Trial on 10/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON.(REICHL, NOLAN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (Attachments: #1 Docket Record, #2 Complaint, #3 Summary Sheet, #4 January 16 Cover Letter to the Court, #5 Summons, #6 January 24 Cover Letter, #7 Motion to Extend Deadline, #8 February 5 Cover Letter, #9 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline, #10 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #11 February 15 Cover Letter)(REICHL, NOLAN)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Parker's representation of the plaintiffs is hereby terminated; the plaintiffs continue to be represented in this matter by Attorney Frenette. Attorney Parker may contact Jenny Wood in the clerk's office to arrange a specially-scheduled swearing-in prior to June, if desired. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Attorney Alex S. Parker to Withdraw as Attorney by JUDI BROWN(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Tait T Brown), JUDI BROWN Responses due by 3/12/2019. (FRENETTE, MARC)
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC N. FRENETTE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (FRENETTE, MARC)
February 15, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney Alex S. Parker shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 2/22/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 2/22/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (bfa)
February 15, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON : Answer due by 2/22/2019. (bfa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 2/22/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
February 15, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1976979.), filed by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON.(REICHL, NOLAN)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (bfa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Nolan L. Reichl re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (bfa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maine Superior Court, Androscoggin County, case number AUBSC-CV-2019-00012. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (Service of Process Deadline 5/16/2019) Fee due by 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 summons, #3 summary sheet, #4 notice regarding electronic service, #5 cover letter, #6 motion to extend deadline, #7 proposed order)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN et al v. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Represented By: NOLAN L. REICHL
Represented By: ALEXANDER B. FEINBERG
Represented By: KATHARINE A. WEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDI BROWN
Represented By: ALEX S PARKER
Represented By: MARC N. FRENETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?