MOSS v. BROCK SERVICES LLC
Plaintiff: ADRIAN MOSS
Defendant: BROCK SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00084
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Set Aside Default Judgment, MOTION for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by BROCK SERVICES LLC Responses due by 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Krystal Hunter, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's counsel email dated 4/18/19, #3 Exhibit C - Employment Policies, #4 Exhibit D - Harassment & Discrimination policy, #5 Exhibit E - Moss Acknowledgment of receipt of policies, #6 Exhibit F - Clough email 5/22/17, #7 Exhibit G - Text messages, #8 Exhibit H - Pay/Job Title Change Forms)(CATERINE, MELINDA). Added MOTION for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on 4/22/2019 (sfw).
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to BROCK SERVICES LLC Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 5/13/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Susan Way. (sfw)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default against Brock Services, LLC by ADRIAN MOSS Responses due by 5/2/2019. (BUTLER, LISA)
April 10, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 5/9/2019. (sfw)
March 27, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint, for BROCK SERVICES LLC : Answer due by 4/9/2019. (sfw)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADRIAN MOSS. BROCK SERVICES LLC served on 3/19/2019. (BUTLER, LISA)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET Amended. (BUTLER, LISA)
March 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BROCK SERVICES LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (sfw)
February 25, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1980640.), filed by ADRIAN MOSS.(BUTLER, LISA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by ADRIAN MOSS against BROCK SERVICES LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.. (Service of Process Deadline 5/23/2019) Fee due by 2/25/2019.(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOSS v. BROCK SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIAN MOSS
Represented By: LISA J. BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROCK SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?