BIOMUNE COMPANY v. CLEAR H2O INC
Plaintiff: BIOMUNE COMPANY
Defendant: CLEAR H2O INC
Counter Defendant: CEVA ANIMAL HEALTH INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00099
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 Joint OBJECTION to #14 Scheduling Order: Telephone Conference set for 5/8/2019 09:30 AM with MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. Counsel shall coordinate the call and contact chambers once both sides are on the line. (nrg)
April 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counterclaim VII and VIII by BIOMUNE COMPANY Responses due by 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(HIRSHON, SARA)
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by DEMETRIO F. ASPIRAS on behalf of CLEAR H2O INC (ASPIRAS, DEMETRIO)
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 Joint OBJECTION to #14 Scheduling Order, filed by BIOMUNE COMPANY. Responses due by 5/16/2019. (HIRSHON, SARA)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 Summons on a Counterclaim Issued as to CEVA ANIMAL HEALTH INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (sfw)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/23/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 8/30/2019. Motions due by 9/13/2019. Ready for Trial on 11/4/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (sfw)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against BIOMUNE COMPANY, CEVA ANIMAL HEALTH INC by CLEAR H2O INC. (Attachments: #1 Counterclaim Exhibit A (Ollis Demand Letter))(PIAMPIANO, JEFFREY) Modified on 4/10/2019 to remove duplicative text(sfw).
March 15, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for CLEAR H2O INC : Answer due by 4/4/2019. (sfw)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CLEAR H2O INC. (PIAMPIANO, JEFFREY)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed CLEAR H2O INC waiver sent on 3/14/2019. (PIAMPIANO, JEFFREY)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY T. PIAMPIANO on behalf of CLEAR H2O INC (PIAMPIANO, JEFFREY)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #6 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice : Docket entry modified by the Clerk's Office to indicate that it was filed in error and will be re-filed by counsel. (mnw)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of 3 filed by SARA ELIZABETH HIRSHON on behalf of BIOMUNE COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 300 receipt number 0100-1986278.) (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Ollis, #2 Pro Hac Vice of Lisa Mandrusiak)(HIRSHON, SARA)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Phillippe J.C. Signore, Esq. filed by SARA ELIZABETH HIRSHON on behalf of BIOMUNE COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1986273.) (HIRSHON, SARA)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR** CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of 3 filed by SARA ELIZABETH HIRSHON on behalf of BIOMUNE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice of Tia D. Fenton, Esq., #2 Pro Hac Vice of Andrew W. Ollis, Esq.)(HIRSHON, SARA) Modified on 3/7/2019 to add filed in error notation, counsel to re-file to pay fee (mnw).
March 6, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1984975.), filed by BIOMUNE COMPANY.(HIRSHON, SARA)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (bfa)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CLEAR H2O INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BIOMUNE COMPANY. (bfa)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CLEAR H2O INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BIOMUNE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 6/3/2019) Fee due by 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 185 patent, #2 Exhibit B - 034 patent, #3 Exhibit C - assignment of patent to Ceva, #4 Exhibit D - assignment of patent to Ceva, #5 Exhibit E - Ceva-Biomune license, #6 Exhibit F - GelDrop product sheet, #7 Exhibit G - HydroDrop product sheet, #8 Exhibit H - screen shot from ClearH2Os website, #9 Exhibit I - screen shot from www.thepoultrysite.com)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIOMUNE COMPANY v. CLEAR H2O INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIOMUNE COMPANY
Represented By: SARA ELIZABETH HIRSHON
Represented By: SETH S. COBURN
Represented By: LISA M. MANDRUSIAK
Represented By: ANDREW M. OLLIS
Represented By: TIA D. FENTON
Represented By: PHILIPPE J.C. SIGNORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAR H2O INC
Represented By: DEMETRIO F. ASPIRAS
Represented By: JEFFREY T. PIAMPIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: CEVA ANIMAL HEALTH INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?