US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. HOLLOWAY et al
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Defendant: HANNAH MONACO and MICAH L HOLLOWAY
Interested Party: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, TOWN OF FALMOUTH and KENNEBUNK SAVINGS BANK
Case Number: 2:2019cv00116
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Reset Deadlines In accordance with order #20: Check for the filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 7/21/2019. (clp)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Continue By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (HORNBY, D.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Continue deadline to file Motion for Entry of Default by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST Responses due by 7/11/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 21, 2019 Set Deadlines : No answer or responsive pleading filed by MICAH L HOLLOWAY. Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 6/21/2019. (mnw)
May 9, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for MICAH L HOLLOWAY - Per Summons Returned Executed #18: Answer due by 5/20/2019. (mnw)
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. MICAH L HOLLOWAY served on 4/29/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 22, 2019 Reset Deadlines - Per Order #17: Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 6/21/2019. (mnw)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Continue By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (HORNBY, D.)
April 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Continue deadline to file Motion for Entry of Default for Hannah Monaco by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST Responses due by 5/10/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 15, 2019 Set Deadlines : No answer or responsive pleading filed by HANNAH MONACO - Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 4/22/2019. (mnw)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 Party-In-Interest ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by TOWN OF FALMOUTH.(HOFFMAN, KELLY)
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by KENNEBUNK SAVINGS BANK. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(CADIGAN, PAUL)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #12 Answer to Complaint: Docket entry modified to remove duplicate attachment descriptions. (jib)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - lien, #2 Exhibit B - agent affidavit)(HUSTON, JENNIFER) Modified on 4/11/2019 to remove duplicate attachment text (jib).
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Dec. in Support of Priority)(CROSMAN, KEVIN)
April 1, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for KENNEBUNK SAVINGS BANK: Answer due by 4/11/2019. (jib)
April 1, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and MAINE REVENUE SERVICES: Answers due by 4/16/2019. (jib)
April 1, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF FALMOUTH: Answer due by 4/12/2019. (jib)
April 1, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for HANNAH MONACO: Answer due by 4/12/2019. (jib)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. KENNEBUNK SAVINGS BANK served on 3/21/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/26/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. MAINE REVENUE SERVICES served on 3/26/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. TOWN OF FALMOUTH served on 3/22/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. HANNAH MONACO served on 3/22/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Federal Rule of Civil Procedures 7.1 by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
March 20, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1992154.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
March 19, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from US BANK TRUST NA by 3/26/2019. (sfw)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MICAH L HOLLOWAY, HANNAH MONACO, TOWN OF FALMOUTH, KENNEBUNK SAVINGS BANK, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Hannah Monaco, #2 Summons Issued as to Town of Falmouth, #3 Summons Issued as to Kennebunk Savings Bank, #4 Summons Issued as to Maine Revenue Services, #5 Summons Issued as to Maine Department of Health and Human Services)(sfw)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICAH L HOLLOWAY, KENNEBUNK SAVINGS BANK, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, HANNAH MONACO, TOWN OF FALMOUTH PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 6/17/2019) Fee due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B: Lost Note Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C: Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D: Assignment into HR Block Bank NA, #5 Exhibit E: Corrective Assignment, #6 Exhibit F: Assignment into HR Block Bank, #7 Exhibit G: Assignment into DLJ Mortgage, #8 Exhibit H: Assignment into US Bank, #9 Exhibit I: Demand Letters, #10 Exhibit J: Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. HOLLOWAY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: JENNIFER G. HUSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Represented By: KEVIN J. CROSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TOWN OF FALMOUTH
Represented By: KELLY M. HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KENNEBUNK SAVINGS BANK
Represented By: PAUL W. CADIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANNAH MONACO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICAH L HOLLOWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?