MCKENNEY v. JOYCE et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT W MCKENNEY
Defendant: LT WILLIAM BRADY, SHERIFF KEVIN JOYCE and DEP CHIEF NALDO GAGNON
Case Number: 2:2019cv00118
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint and #4 Complaint filed by ROBERT W MCKENNEY. Objections to R&R due by 7/22/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk's Office Regarding Collection of Fees (lrc)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 INDICATION by Prisoner ROBERT W MCKENNEY of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lrc)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 MAIL (Order No. 6) sent to Robert McKenney returned as undeliverable. Reason: Unable to Forward. Resent to Robert McKenney at York County Jail, 1 Layman Way, Alfred, ME 04002. (lrc)
April 16, 2019 Set Deadlines: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 5/7/2019. (MFS)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 5/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 Signed Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by ROBERT W MCKENNEY re #2 Unsigned Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (lrc)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Signed Complaint filed by ROBERT W MCKENNEY re #1 Unsigned Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Copy of Order)(lrc)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Complaint. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 (Unsigned) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT W MCKENNEY. (Attachments: #1 Resident Account Summary (page 2 not received))(jgd)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 (Unsigned) COMPLAINT against WILLIAM BRADY, NALDO GAGNON, KEVIN JOYCE, filed by ROBERT W MCKENNEY. (Service of Process Deadline 6/18/2019) (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim, #2 Grievance Procedure Remedy, #3 Envelope) (jgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCKENNEY v. JOYCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT WILLIAM BRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF KEVIN JOYCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEP CHIEF NALDO GAGNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT W MCKENNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?