CITY OF SANFORD v. PURDUE PHARMA LP et al
Plaintiff: CITY OF SANFORD
Defendant: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, WALGREEN CO, PURDUE PHARMA LP, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO, ALLERGAN PLC, CEPHALON INC, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, RITE AID CORPORATION, WALMART INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC, CVS PHARMACY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC, ORTHO-MCNEIL- JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ACTAVIS LLC and ACTAVIS PHARMA INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00146
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
2 Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER OF RECUSAL. JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY for all further proceedings By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mlm)
May 13, 2019 Filing 42 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Electronic Civil Case Transfer. Case electronically transferred to Northern District of Ohio has been opened on 5/13/2019 as case 1:19-po-45311. (jwr)
May 8, 2019 Filing 40 Multidistrict Litigation (MDL)case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. (mnw)
May 8, 2019 Filing 39 MDL CERTIFIED ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (mnw)
May 7, 2019 Filing 38 MDL ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (mnw)
April 30, 2019 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC. (HAWKINS, CHRISTOPHER)
April 30, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC & CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC by 5/8/2019. (mnw)
April 29, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES M. CAMPBELL on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL- JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (CAMPBELL, JAMES)
April 29, 2019 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL- JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE)
April 29, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles C. Lifland filed by MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL- JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2012239.) (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE)
April 29, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL- JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE)
April 26, 2019 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
April 26, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donna M. Welch, P.C. filed by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2011088.) (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
April 18, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ethan Severance filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2007613.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA)
April 18, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Geiger filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2007612.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA)
April 18, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of K. Neil Austin filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2007610.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA)
April 18, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificates due from CHARLES C. LIFLAND & DONNA WELCH by 4/26/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (mnw)
April 18, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL- JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC & CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC by 4/26/2019. (mnw)
April 17, 2019 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, CEPHALON INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
April 16, 2019 Filing 41 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION re #17 State Court Record. Main Document: Docket Record for York County Superior Court Case No. ALFSC-CV-2019-00022. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Demand Letter to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, #3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Actavis LL, #4 Exhibit 3 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Actavis Pharma Inc, #5 Exhibit 4 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Allergan PLC, #6 Exhibit 5 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Bruel, #7 Exhibit 6 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Cardinal Health Inc, #8 Exhibit 7 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Cephalon Inc, #9 Exhibit 8 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Cieniawski, #10 Exhibit 9 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #11 Exhibit 10 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #12 Exhibit 11 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Insys Therapeutics Inc, #13 Exhibit 12 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Janssen Pharmaceutica, #14 Exhibit 13 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #15 Exhibit 14 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Johnson & Johnson, #16 Exhibit 15 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Jorgensen, #17 Exhibit 16 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, #18 Exhibit 17 to Complaint - Demand Letter to McKesson Corp, #19 Exhibit 18 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #20 Exhibit 19 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Purdue Frederick Co, #21 Exhibit 20 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Purdue Pharma Inc, #22 Exhibit 21 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Purdue Pharma LP, #23 Exhibit 22 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, #24 Exhibit 23 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Watson Laboratories, #25 Purdue Pharma Inc et al's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #26 AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #27 Cardinal Health 110 LLC's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #28 Endo Health Solutions Inc et al's Acknowledgtement and Acceptance of Service, #29 Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #30 AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, #31 Cardinal Health 110 LLC's Assented to Motion to Extend Time, #32 Entry of Appearance Hawkins, #33 McKesson Corp's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #34 McKesson Corp's Assented to Motion to Extend Deadline, #35 Notice of Entry of Appearance Hanlon, #36 CVS Pharmacy Inc's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #37 Actavis LLC et al's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #38 Rite Aid Corp et al's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #39 Walmart Inc's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #40 Order Granting AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Consent Motion, #41 Order Granting Cardinal Health 110 LLC's Assented to Motion, #42 Order Granting McKesson Corp's Assented to Motion, #43 Walgreen Boots Alliance Inc's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #44 Allergan Finance LLC's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #45 Retail Pharmacy Defendants' Assented to Motion to Extend Deadlines, #46 Insys Therapeutics Inc's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #47 Bruehl and Cieniawski's Consented to Motion to Extend Deadline, #48 Cieniawski and Bruehl's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #49 Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc et al's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #50 Order Granting Retail Pharmacy Defendant's Assented to Motion, #51 Order Granting Bruehl and Cieniawski's Consented to Motion, #52 AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(mnw)
April 16, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Cheffo filed by RITCHIE E. BERGER on behalf of PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2006474.) (BERGER, RITCHIE)
April 16, 2019 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP. (BERGER, RITCHIE)
April 16, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by RITCHIE E. BERGER on behalf of PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP (BERGER, RITCHIE)
April 16, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #20 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice : Docket entry modified by the Clerk's Office to reflect that it was filed in error and has been re-filed as ECF No. 22. (mnw)
April 15, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. O'Connor and Brien T. O'Connor filed by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (Attachments: #1 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice - BT O'Connor)(WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
April 15, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC. (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
April 15, 2019 Filing 20 **FILED IN ERROR** CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. O'Connor and Brien T. O'Connor filed by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number 0100-2005796.) (Attachments: #1 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice - BT O'Connor)(WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) Modified on 4/16/2019 to reflect that this docket entry was filed in error and has been re-filed as ECF No. 22 (mnw).
April 15, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS PHARMACY. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
April 15, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Conor B. O'Croinin filed by GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ on behalf of CVS PHARMACY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2005789.) (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
April 15, 2019 Filing 17 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA)
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC. (CAHOON, JOSEPH)
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS and MARK G. LAVOIE on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) Modified on 4/15/2019 to clean up text (mnw).
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC. (PETRUCCELLI, GERALD)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI on behalf of RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC (PETRUCCELLI, GERALD)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Lovrien filed by DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY on behalf of WALMART INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2004330.) (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALMART INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (WOLF, KAREN)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Zane Watts filed by KAREN FRINK WOLF on behalf of ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2003943.) (WOLF, KAREN)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (HANLON, MELISSA)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended for all Defendants to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 9, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2003295.), filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION.(DUNLAP, JOSHUA)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION Responses due by 4/30/2019. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 4/15/2019. By Melody Whitten, Deputy Clerk (mnw)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from the Clerk's Office to the Clerk of the MDL Panel. (mnw)
April 8, 2019 Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificates due by 4/15/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (mnw)
April 8, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 4/15/2019. (mnw)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (mnw)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mnw)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County Superior Court, case number CV-19-22, filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 7/5/2019) PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. Fee due by 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua D. Dunlap, Esq., #2 Exhibit A to Dunlap Declaration - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Demand Letter to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #4 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Actavis LLC, #5 Exhibit 3 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Actavis Pharma Inc, #6 Exhibit 4 to Complant - Demand Letter to Allergan PLC, #7 Exhibit 5 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Bruehl, #8 Exhibit 6 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Cardinal Health Inc, #9 Exhibit 7 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Cephalon Inc, #10 Exhibit 8 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Cieniawski, #11 Exhibit 9 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #12 Exhibit 10 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #13 Exhibit 11 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Insys Therapeutics Inc, #14 Exhibit 12 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Janssen Pharmaceutica, #15 Exhibit 13 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #16 Exhibit 14 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Johnson & Johnson, #17 Exhibit 15 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Jorgensen, #18 Exhibit 16 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, #19 Exhibit 17 to Complaint - Demand Letter to McKesson Corporation, #20 Exhibit 18 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #21 Exhibit 19 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Purdue Frederick Company, #22 Exhibit 20 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Purdue Pharma Inc, #23 Exhibit 21 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Purdue Pharma LP, #24 Exhibit 22 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, #25 Exhibit 23 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Watson Laboratories)(mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITY OF SANFORD v. PURDUE PHARMA LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC
Represented By: JOSEPH L. CAHOON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: MELISSA M. HANLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN CO
Represented By: JOSEPH L. CAHOON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA LP
Represented By: MARK CHEFFO
Represented By: RITCHIE E. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC
Represented By: GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD
Represented By: MARK G. LAVOIE
Represented By: JOSHUA D. HADIARIS
Represented By: DAVID R. GEIGER
Represented By: ETHAN SEVERANCE
Represented By: K. NEIL AUSTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO
Represented By: MAUREEN M. STURTEVANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEPHALON INC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF MAINE INC
Represented By: GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Represented By: RYAN ZANE WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID CORPORATION
Represented By: GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC
Represented By: DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER LOVRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY
Represented By: MARK CHEFFO
Represented By: RITCHIE E. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC
Represented By: DONNA WELCH
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC
Represented By: KELLY MARTIN MALONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY
Represented By: GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ
Represented By: CONOR B. O'CROININ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA INC
Represented By: MARK CHEFFO
Represented By: RITCHIE E. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD
Represented By: MARK G. LAVOIE
Represented By: JOSHUA D. HADIARIS
Represented By: DAVID R. GEIGER
Represented By: ETHAN SEVERANCE
Represented By: K. NEIL AUSTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES INC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER D. HAWKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Represented By: RYAN ZANE WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSHUA D. DUNLAP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK
Represented By: ANDREW J. O'CONNOR
Represented By: BRIEN T. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL- JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA INC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF SANFORD
Represented By: ADAM R. LEE
Represented By: JAMES E. BELLEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?