ADAMS v. A DUIE PYLE INC
Plaintiff: SARAH ADAMS
Defendant: A DUIE PYLE INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00148
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/29/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 11/5/2019. Motions due by 11/19/2019. Ready for Trial on 2/3/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lee E. Tankle, Christopher J. Moran filed by TAWNY L. ALVAREZ on behalf of A DUIE PYLE INC (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number 0100-2032862.) (Attachments: #1 Christopher J. Moran)(ALVAREZ, TAWNY)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by A DUIE PYLE INC.(ALVAREZ, TAWNY)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT A. Duie Pyle, Inc. by A DUIE PYLE INC. (ALVAREZ, TAWNY)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 **FILED IN ERROR** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Christopher J. Moran by A DUIE PYLE INC. (ALVAREZ, TAWNY) Modified on 6/11/2019 to mark as filed in error. Counsel have been instructed to re-file as Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice(sfw).
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 **FILED IN ERROR** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Lee Tankle by A DUIE PYLE INC. (ALVAREZ, TAWNY) Modified on 6/11/2019 to indicate this was filed in error. Counsel have been instructed to re-file as Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice(sfw).
April 30, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint, for A DUIE PYLE INC : Answer due by 6/10/2019. (sfw)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed A DUIE PYLE INC waiver sent on 4/11/2019. (CLIFFORD, JAMES)
April 11, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2004660.), filed by SARAH ADAMS.(CLIFFORD, JAMES)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A DUIE PYLE INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SARAH ADAMS. (Service of Process Deadline 7/9/2019) Fee due by 4/12/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADAMS v. A DUIE PYLE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH ADAMS
Represented By: ANDREW P. COTTER
Represented By: JAMES A. CLIFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A DUIE PYLE INC
Represented By: LEE E. TANKLE
Represented By: TAWNY L. ALVAREZ
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?