US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. PELLETIER et al

Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Defendant: DANIEL J PELLETIER and LORI A PELLETIER
Interested Party: CENTRAL MAINE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION and MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2019cv00150
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Set Deadlines: Pursuant to the Order at ECF 17, Amended Complaint due by 7/15/2019. (tcs)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint on or before July 15, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed AMENDED COMPLAINT to add a new Notice of State Tax Lien filed by Maine Revenue Services against DANIEL J PELLETIER, LORI A PELLETIER, filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 10/1/2019)(LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 7/3/2019 to indicate this is a proposed Amended Complaint (sfw).
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend #11 Amended Complaint, to add a new Notice of State Tax Lien filed by Maine Revenue Services by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST Responses due by 7/24/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, DANIEL J PELLETIER, LORI A PELLETIER Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 7/12/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Susan Way. (sfw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants, Daniel J. Pelletier and Lori A. Pelletier, and Party-in-Interest, Maine Revenue Services by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST Responses due by 7/2/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN)
May 15, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 6/14/2019 as to MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. (sfw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST re #11 Amended Complaint, (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 13, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 6/12/2019 as to DANIEL J PELLETIER, LORI A PELLETIER. (sfw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT to Remove Party-in-Interest, Central Maine Federal Credit Union f/k/a Ste. Croix Regional FCU against All Defendants, filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 8/8/2019)(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 1, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for MAINE REVENUE SERVICES : Answer due by 5/14/2019. (sfw)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. MAINE REVENUE SERVICES served on 4/23/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 30, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for CENTRAL MAINE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION : Answer due by 5/10/2019. (sfw)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. CENTRAL MAINE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION served on 4/19/2019 (DOONAN, JOHN) Modified on 4/30/2019 to add which defendant was served and date they were served on (sfw).
April 29, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for DANIEL J PELLETIER, LORI A PELLETIER : Answer due by 5/10/2019. (sfw)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. CENTRAL MAINE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION served on 4/19/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN) Modified on 4/29/2019 to indicate filed in error(sfw).
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. LORI A PELLETIER served on 4/19/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. DANIEL J PELLETIER served on 4/19/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT With Certificate of Service by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 11, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2004406.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 10, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/17/2019. (bfa)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CENTRAL MAINE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, DANIEL J PELLETIER, LORI A PELLETIER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Daniel J. Pelletier summons, #2 Central Maine Federal Credit Union summons, #3 Maine Revenue Services summons)(bfa)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DANIEL J PELLETIER, LORI A PELLETIER PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 7/9/2019) Fee due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Loan Repayment and Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Household Finance, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into U.S. Bank, #6 Exhibit F Demand Letters, #7 Exhibit G Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. PELLETIER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CENTRAL MAINE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL J PELLETIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI A PELLETIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?