WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB v. GRIMALDI et al

Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA NA, SUSAN GRIMALDI and DAVID GRIMALDI
Interested Party: DAVID BRANDT and NORWAY SAVINGS BANK
Case Number: 2:2019cv00152
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by NORWAY SAVINGS BANK.(GREENFIELD, ZACHARY)
June 28, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Amended Complaint for NORWAY SAVINGS BANK : Answer due by 7/11/2019. (sfw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB. NORWAY SAVINGS BANK served on 6/20/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to NORWAY SAVINGS BANK. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (sfw) (sfw).
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT to Add Party-in-Interest, Norway Savings Bank against DAVID GRIMALDI, SUSAN GRIMALDI, filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB. (Service of Process Deadline 9/17/2019)(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to BANK OF AMERICA NA, DAVID BRANDT, DAVID GRIMALDI, SUSAN GRIMALDI Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 7/12/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Susan Way. (sfw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Default as to David Grimaldi, Susan Grimaldi, David Brandt, and Bank of America, N.A. by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB Responses due by 7/2/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN)
June 4, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 7/5/2019 as to DAVID GRIMALDI, SUSAN GRIMALDI. (sfw)
May 17, 2019 Set Deadlines Regarding Complaint : Check for Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 6/17/2019 as to BANK OF AMERICA, NA and DAVID BRANDT. No Answer or responsive pleading having been filed by 5/13/2019 as to DAVID BRANDT. No Answer or responsive pleading having been filed by 5/14/2019 as to BANK OF AMERICA, NA. (sfw)
May 17, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for DAVID GRIMALDI, SUSAN GRIMALDI : Answer due by 6/3/2019. (sfw)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #12 Summons Returned Executed, #11 Summons Returned Executed, #10 Summons Returned Executed : These docket entries were modified to fix the served on dates from the 4/19/2019 date that was previously docketed #10 was served on 4/22/2019; #11 and #12 were served on 5/13/2019 (sfw)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB. SUSAN GRIMALDI served on 5/13/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN) Modified on 5/17/2019 to fix served on date to be 5/13/2019 and not 4/19/2019 as was previously docketed (sfw).
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB. DAVID GRIMALDI served on 5/13/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN) Modified on 5/17/2019 to fix served on date to be 5/13/2019 and not 4/19/2019 as was previously docketed(sfw).
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB. DAVID BRANDT served on 4/22/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN) Modified on 5/17/2019 to fix served on date to be 4/22/2019 and not 4/19/2019 as was previously docketed (sfw).
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB. BANK OF AMERICA NA served on 4/23/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. DOONAN on behalf of WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 11, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2004462.), filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB.(DOONAN, JOHN)
April 11, 2019 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB by 4/18/2019. (slg)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to DAVID BRANDT. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BANK OF AMERICA NA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SUSAN GRIMALDI. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DAVID GRIMALDI. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BANK OF AMERICA NA, DAVID GRIMALDI, SUSAN GRIMALDI, DAVID BRANDT filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB. (Service of Process Deadline 7/10/2019) Fee due by 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment to FHLMC, #5 Exhibit E - Assignment to Wells Fargo, #6 Exhibit F - Assignment to Wilmington, #7 Exhibit G - Loan Modification, #8 Exhibit H - Demand Letter, #9 Exhibit I - Military Affidavit)(slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB v. GRIMALDI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN GRIMALDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID GRIMALDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DAVID BRANDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NORWAY SAVINGS BANK
Represented By: ZACHARY I. GREENFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?