HSBC BANK USA v. GENDREAU

Plaintiff: HSBC BANK USA
Defendant: AMANDA R GENDREAU
Case Number: 2:2019cv00153
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #11 Order on Motion for Judgment :changed title from ORDER to CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE. (tcs)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE granting #10 Motion for Judgment By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Property Description) (tcs) Modified on 7/1/2019 to correct title(tcs).
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment by HSBC BANK USA Responses due by 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consente Judgment of Foreclosure)(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/25/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/2/2019. Motions due by 10/16/2019. Ready for Trial on 1/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (akr)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by AMANDA R GENDREAU.(GALLITTO, WILLIAM)
April 26, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for AMANDA R GENDREAU : Answer due by 5/10/2019. (akr)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HSBC BANK USA. AMANDA R GENDREAU served on 4/19/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HSBC BANK USA. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of HSBC BANK USA (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: The duplicate Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card on 04/16/2019 by HSBC BANK USA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2006352) has been VOIDED. (mlm)
April 16, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2006352.), filed by HSBC BANK USA.(DOONAN, JOHN)
April 11, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2004523.), filed by HSBC BANK USA.(DOONAN, JOHN)
April 11, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/18/2019 from HSBC BANK USA. (sfw)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AMANDA R GENDREAU. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (sfw)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMANDA R GENDREAU PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by HSBC BANK USA. (Service of Process Deadline 7/10/2019) Fee due by 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B: Note, #3 Exhibit C: Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D: Assignment to HSBC, #5 Exhibit E: Assignment to HSBC 2, #6 Exhibit F: Quitclaim Assignment to HSBC, #7 Exhibit G: Demand Letter, #8 Exhibit H: Military Affidavit)(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSBC BANK USA v. GENDREAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA R GENDREAU
Represented By: WILLIAM J. GALLITTO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSBC BANK USA
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?