BEDIVERE INSURANCE COMPANY v. KENNEBUNK SEWER DISTRICT

Plaintiff: BEDIVERE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: KENNEBUNK SEWER DISTRICT
Case Number: 2:2019cv00163
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by COLIN B. REILLY on behalf of KENNEBUNK SEWER DISTRICT (REILLY, COLIN)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/24/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/31/2019. Motions due by 11/14/2019. Ready for Trial on 1/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by KENNEBUNK SEWER DISTRICT.(MORIN, BRADLEY)
May 31, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for KENNEBUNK SEWER DISTRICT per Waiver of Service Returned Executed on 5/31/2019: Answer due by 6/17/2019. (lrc)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed KENNEBUNK SEWER DISTRICT waiver sent on 4/17/2019. (POLGLASE, HOLLY)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kara A. Loridas filed by KARA LORIDAS on behalf of BEDIVERE INSURANCE COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2006782.) (LORIDAS, KARA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter G. Hermes filed by PETER G. HERMES on behalf of BEDIVERE INSURANCE COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2006775.) (HERMES, PETER)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BEDIVERE INSURANCE COMPANY. (POLGLASE, HOLLY)
April 16, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2006456.), filed by BEDIVERE INSURANCE COMPANY.(POLGLASE, HOLLY)
April 16, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/23/2019. (bfa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KENNEBUNK SEWER DISTRICT. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KENNEBUNK SEWER DISTRICT with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BEDIVERE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 7/15/2019) Fee due by 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint filed in the Underlying Action, #2 Exhibit B - letter dated January 15, 2019 from KSD to Bedivere, #3 Exhibit C - January 22, 2019 reservation)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEDIVERE INSURANCE COMPANY v. KENNEBUNK SEWER DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNEBUNK SEWER DISTRICT
Represented By: COLIN B. REILLY
Represented By: BRADLEY C. MORIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEDIVERE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: HOLLY M. POLGLASE
Represented By: KARA LORIDAS
Represented By: PETER G. HERMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?