POSHPECK v. HANNAFORD BROS CO LLC
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER POSHPECK
Defendant: HANNAFORD BROS CO LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00180
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 11/22/2019. Motions due by 12/6/2019. Ready for Trial on 2/3/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jwr)
June 28, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney Timothy Simms Laughinghouse shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 7/5/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jwr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tyler Simms Laughinghouse filed by TIMOTHY J. O'BRIEN on behalf of HANNAFORD BROS CO LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2041139.) (O'BRIEN, TIMOTHY)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HANNAFORD BROS CO LLC. (O'BRIEN, TIMOTHY)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties by HANNAFORD BROS CO LLC (O'BRIEN, TIMOTHY)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HANNAFORD BROS CO LLC.(O'BRIEN, TIMOTHY) Modified on 6/28/2019 to remove reference to jury demand, not demanded in answer (jwr).
May 9, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for HANNAFORD BROS CO LLC : Answer due by 6/28/2019. (mlm)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed HANNAFORD BROS CO LLC waiver sent on 4/29/2019. (RIOTTE, SAMUEL)
April 29, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2012127.), filed by CHRISTOPHER POSHPECK.(RIOTTE, SAMUEL)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HANNAFORD BROS CO LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HANNAFORD BROS CO LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CHRISTOPHER POSHPECK. (Service of Process Deadline 7/29/2019) Fee due by 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - right to sue notice from the Equal Employment Commission, #2 Exhibit B - right to sue letter from the Maine Human Rights Commission)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POSHPECK v. HANNAFORD BROS CO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANNAFORD BROS CO LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY J. O'BRIEN
Represented By: TYLER SIMMS LAUGHINGHOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER POSHPECK
Represented By: SAMUEL S. RIOTTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?