LOPES v. ATRIUM MEDICAL CORPORATION, et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD LOPES
Defendant: MAQUET CARDIOVASCULAR US SALES LLC, GETINGE AB and ATRIUM MEDICAL CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00188
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Electronic Civil Case Transfer. Case electronically transferred to District of New Hampshie has been opened on 05/24/2019 as case 1:19-cv-02779. (mlm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 Multidistrict Litigation (MDL)case electronically transferred to New Hampshire. (mlm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 MDL CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (mjlt)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (jwr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-12) Finalized on 5/13/19. Please see pleading ( 110 in MDL No. 2753, 3 in ME/2:19-cv-00188).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the D. New Hampshire for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 5/13/2019.(jwr)
May 1, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2013238.), filed by RICHARD LOPES.(FITZGERALD, KEVIN)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER to MDL Panel. (jgd)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ATRIUM MEDICAL CORPORATION, GETINGE AB, MAQUET CARDIOVASCULAR US SALES LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons-Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales LLC, #2 Summons-Getinge AB) (jgd)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jgd)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ATRIUM MEDICAL CORPORATION, GETINGE AB, MAQUET CARDIOVASCULAR US SALES LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by RICHARD LOPES. (Service of Process Deadline 7/29/2019) Fee due by 5/2/2019.(jgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOPES v. ATRIUM MEDICAL CORPORATION, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAQUET CARDIOVASCULAR US SALES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GETINGE AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATRIUM MEDICAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD LOPES
Represented By: KEVIN M. FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?