BERNARDO v. GCA SERVICES GROUP INC et al
Plaintiff: FELICIA BERNARDO
Defendant: GCA SERVICES GROUP OF NORTH CAROLINA INC, PRATT & WHITNEY, CBRE INC and GCA SERVICES GROUP INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00199
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by FELICIA BERNARDO (TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
May 7, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2016647.), filed by FELICIA BERNARDO.(TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CBRE INC, GCA SERVICES GROUP INC, GCA SERVICES GROUP OF NORTH CAROLINA INC, PRATT & WHITNEY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 CBRE, Inc summons, #2 GCA Services Group, Inc summons, #3 Pratt & Whitney summons)(bfa)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CBRE INC, GCA SERVICES GROUP INC, GCA SERVICES GROUP OF NORTH CAROLINA INC, PRATT & WHITNEY with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FELICIA BERNARDO. (Service of Process Deadline 8/5/2019) Fee due by 5/8/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BERNARDO v. GCA SERVICES GROUP INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCA SERVICES GROUP OF NORTH CAROLINA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRATT & WHITNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBRE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCA SERVICES GROUP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELICIA BERNARDO
Represented By: ALLAN K. TOWNSEND
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?