PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE v. SIDELINGER

Plaintiff: PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE
Defendant: DODI S SIDELINGER
Cross Defendant: FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NA
Cross Claimant: DENNIS CAREY
Interested Party: TYGDON LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00220
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by DODI S SIDELINGER.(LOGAN, J.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 Dennis Carey ANSWER to Complaint Prof-2014-S2, First CROSSCLAIM Dennis Carey against FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NA, First COUNTERCLAIM Dennis Carey against PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE by DENNIS CAREY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Counterclaim Exhibit I] Carey Mortgage, #2 Exhibit [Counterclaim Exhibit II] Carey Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit [Counterclaim Exhibit III] Clerks Certificate, #4 Exhibit [Counterclaim Exhibit IV] Order of Foreclosure, #5 Exhibit [Counterclaim Exhibit V] Mortgage First Horizon Home Loan Corporation)(CHUTE, STEPHEAN)
June 28, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Per ECF No.15 Affadavit of Service served against First Tennessee Bank NA formerly known as FIRST HORIZON HOME LOAN CORPORATION on 6/3/19: Answer due by 7/19/2019. (clp)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE. FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NA served on 6/3/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 28, 2019 Set Deadlines as to TYGDON LLC : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 7/29/2019. (clp)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #8 Affidavit and Answer of Tygdon, LLC. Party-in-interest Tygdon, LLC's answer, ECF No. 8, is hereby stricken. Tygdon, LLC has failed to respond to the court's order advising it that it cannot be represented in this matter by its Manager and Registered Agent and ordering that it show cause why the answer filed by her on its behalf should not be stricken, ECF No. 9. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
June 25, 2019 Set Deadlines: Dennis Carey's Answer was due 6/24/19: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 7/25/2019. (clp)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting without objection #6 Motion for mediation. See ECF No. 10. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
June 17, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline in accordance with Judge Rich's order dated 6/17/19: Dennis Carey's Answer due by 6/24/2019. (clp)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting without objection #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Party-in-interest Dennis Carey shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by June 24, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Party-In-Interest Dennis Carey by PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE Responses due by 7/5/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Request for Mediation #6 by PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 6/17/2019 to link to Request for Mediation (clp).
June 12, 2019 Set Deadlines in accordance with Judge Rich's order dated 6/11/2019: Tygdon LLC shall secure counsel to represent it in this action or show case why its answer should not be stricken due by 6/25/2019. (clp)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Answer to Complaint filed by TYGDON LLC. By June 25, 2019, or within 14 days hereof, the party-in-interest Tygdon, LLC shall secure counsel to represent it in this action or show cause why its answer should not be stricken. The party-in-interest Tygdon, LLC, assertedly a corporation in good standing with the Maine Secretary of State, must obtain representation by an attorney in order to appear in this action. See, e.g., United States v. J.K. Wright, Inc., Civil No. 07-116-B-W, 2007 WL 4608724, at *1 (D. Me. 2007) ("[C]orporations cannot enter pro se appearances and cannot be represented by individuals not licensed as an attorney."). The answer was filed by Maurice Schmir, Tygdon LLC's Manager and Registered Agent. Mr. Schmir is not admitted to the Bar of this Court, and it does not appear that he is an attorney licensed to practice on behalf of the defendant. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 6/28/19***AFFIDAVIT OF MAURICE SCHMIR re: ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by TYGDON LLC. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Execution)(mjlt) Modified on 6/28/2019 to reflect this is stricken(clp).
June 7, 2019 Set Answer Deadline : Answer due by 6/10/2019. Per summons executed 5/20/19 ECF #7 (clp)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE. TYGDON LLC served on 5/20/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Request for Mediation, by DODI S SIDELINGER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(clp) Modified on 6/17/2019 to change Event Type to Request for Mediation (clp).
June 3, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for Dennis Carey The Interested Party was served on 5/25/19: Answer due by 6/17/2019. (clp)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE. DENNIS CAREY served on 5/25/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Federal Rule of Civil Procedures 7.1 by PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 23, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE by 5/30/2019. (mnw)
May 17, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2021493.), filed by PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 16, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/22/2019 from PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE. (sfw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DENNIS CAREY, FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NA, DODI S SIDELINGER, TYGDON LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to First Tennessee Bank NA, #2 Summons Issued as to Dennis Carey, #3 Summons Issued as to Tygdon, LLC)(sfw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DENNIS CAREY, FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NA, DODI S SIDELINGER, TYGDON LLC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE. (Service of Process Deadline 8/14/2019) Fee due by 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B: Note, #3 Exhibit C: Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D: Assignment into FNMA, #5 Exhibit E: Assignment into US Bank, #6 Exhibit F: 2007 Loan Modification, #7 Exhibit G: 2013 Loan Modification, #8 Exhibit H: Demand Letter, #9 Exhibit I: Affidavit Relating to Military Service)(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE v. SIDELINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: DENNIS CAREY
Represented By: STEPHEAN C. CHUTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TYGDON LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DODI S SIDELINGER
Represented By: J. SCOTT LOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?