SMITH v. STATE OF MAINE
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH SMITH
Defendant: STATE OF MAINE
Not Yet Classified: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - NON PRISONER IFP CASES
Case Number: 2:2019cv00222
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 24 MAIL (Order Affirming the Recommended Decision of the Magistrate Judge (ECF No. 20)) sent to Elizabeth Smith returned as undeliverable. Reason: No Mail Receptacle, unable to forward. (lrc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint filed by ELIZABETH SMITH. Objections to R&R due by 7/22/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Consider Filings. Because Plaintiff's filings in 18-cv-202 includes the same or similar allegations as asserted in this action and because Plaintiff's complaint in 2:18-cv-202-GZS was dismissed without prejudice, Plaintiff's allegations asserted in 2:18-cv-202-GZS will be considered as part of Plaintiff's allegations in this case. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 MAIL (ECF Docket No. 18) sent to Elizabeth Smith returned as undeliverable. Reason: Return to Sender, No Mail Receptacle, Unable to Forward. (lrc)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE #18 . By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #18 Report and Recommended Decision. filed by ELIZABETH SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A- Filing made on 5/15/2019, #2 Attachment B- Potion of Information for Pro Se FIlers, #3 Attachment C- Service of Process Request, #4 Request for Emergency Review of Objection)(lrc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ELIZABETH SMITH. Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Consider Case Number 2:18-cv-202-GZS by ELIZABETH SMITH (lrc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 Supplement to #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ELIZABETH SMITH (lrc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (lrc)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER mooting #9 Motion for Expedited Ruling on Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court has ruled on the motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (Order, ECF No. 13.) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ELIZABETH SMITH (lrc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 Supplement filed by ELIZABETH SMITH re #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (lrc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Supplement filed by ELIZABETH SMITH re #1 Complaint. Main document- First Supplement to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Additional Supplement to Complaint)(lrc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Expedited Ruling on Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by ELIZABETH SMITH (lrc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ELIZABETH SMITH (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion filed in Case No. 2:16-cv-164-DBH)(lrc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 United States Postal Service Certificate of Mailing submitted filed by ELIZABETH SMITH (lrc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 MAIL (Order No. 5) sent to Elizabeth Smith returned as undeliverable. Reason: Return to Sender, No Mail Receptacle, Unable to Forward. (lrc)
May 24, 2019 Set Deadlines: Filing Fee or Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due by 6/11/2019. (MFS)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IFP or filing fee due by 6/11/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 MAIL (Letter Re: Pro Se Parties and Handout) sent to Elizabeth Smith returned as undeliverable. Reason: Return to Sender, No Such Number, Unable to Forward. (lrc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (bfa)
May 17, 2019 Set Deadlines : Pro Se Appearance Form due on 5/31/2019. (bfa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ELIZABETH SMITH (bfa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STATE OF MAINE, filed by ELIZABETH SMITH. (Service of Process Deadline 8/13/2019)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. STATE OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - NON PRISONER IFP CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?