PUNSKY v. CITY OF PORTLAND et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN PUNSKY
Defendant: PTL DARREL GIBSON, CHIEF VERN MALLOCH, PTL JONATHAN JAMES CACKEE, SGT CHRISTOPHER DYER, SGT JACOB TITCOMB, CITY OF PORTLAND, PTL KIMBERLY ANN DONNELL and PTL JONATHAN JAMES LACKEE
Case Number: 2:2019cv00235
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by CHRISTOPHER DYER, DARREL GIBSON, VERN MALLOCH, JACOB TITCOMB.(WALL, JOHN)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by STEVEN PUNSKY. (Service of Process Deadline 9/3/2019)(BENNETT, JEFFREY)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting without objection #5 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. REMINDER: Upon entry of this order, counsel for the plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint document, ECF No. 5-2, as a separate filing on the court's docket forthwith. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
June 1, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by STEVEN PUNSKY Responses due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Second Amended Complaint)(BENNETT, JEFFREY)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by CHRISTOPHER DYER, DARREL GIBSON, VERN MALLOCH, JACOB TITCOMB.(WALL, JOHN)
May 23, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for Darrel Gibson, Jacob Titcomb, Christopher Dyer, Vern Malloch : Answer due by 5/29/2019. (bfa)
May 23, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2024528.), filed by JACOB TITCOMB, CHRISTOPHER DYER, VERN MALLOCH, DARREL GIBSON.(WALL, JOHN)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by CHRISTOPHER DYER, DARREL GIBSON, VERN MALLOCH, JACOB TITCOMB. (Attachments: #1 docket sheet, #2 summary sheet, #3 complaint, #4 first amended complaint, #5 notice of filing first amended complaint, #6 Malloch acceptance of service, #7 Dyer acceptance of service, #8 Titcomb acceptance of service, #9 Gibson acceptance of service, #10 notice of removal)(bfa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET with certificate of service. (WALL, JOHN)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-19-123. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JACOB TITCOMB, CHRISTOPHER DYER, VERN MALLOCH, DARREL GIBSON. (Service of Process Deadline 8/20/2019) Fee due by 5/24/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PUNSKY v. CITY OF PORTLAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTL DARREL GIBSON
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF VERN MALLOCH
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTL JONATHAN JAMES CACKEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT CHRISTOPHER DYER
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT JACOB TITCOMB
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PORTLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTL KIMBERLY ANN DONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTL JONATHAN JAMES LACKEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN PUNSKY
Represented By: JEFFREY BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?