COFFEE BY DESIGN INC v. 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC et al
Plaintiff: COFFEE BY DESIGN INC
Defendant: JOHN DOE INDIVIDUALS, JOHN DOE ENTITIES, 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC and DESERT LAKE GROUP LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00241
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Set Answer Deadlines for 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC & DESERT LAKE GROUP LLC - Per Acceptance of Service #7: Answers due by 9/20/2019. (mnw)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC served on 7/22/2019; DESERT LAKE GROUP LLC served on 7/22/2019. (MARASS, PATRICK)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by COFFEE BY DESIGN INC. (MARASS, PATRICK)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward J. Sackman filed by PATRICK I. MARASS on behalf of COFFEE BY DESIGN INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2026573.) (MARASS, PATRICK)
May 29, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2026486.), filed by COFFEE BY DESIGN INC.(MARASS, PATRICK)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (bfa)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC, DESERT LAKE GROUP LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Desert Lake Group, LLC summons)(bfa)
May 29, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/5/2019. (bfa)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC, DESERT LAKE GROUP LLC, JOHN DOE ENTITIES, JOHN DOE INDIVIDUALS with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by COFFEE BY DESIGN INC. (Service of Process Deadline 8/26/2019) Fee due by 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Registration)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COFFEE BY DESIGN INC v. 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE INDIVIDUALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE ENTITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESERT LAKE GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COFFEE BY DESIGN INC
Represented By: EDWARD J. SACKMAN
Represented By: PATRICK I. MARASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?