BAKER et al v. GOODMAN et al

Plaintiff: SHANTEL L BAKER and TERRY R BAKER
Defendant: JOHN DOE, NICHOLAS GOODMAN and COASTAL PAWN SHOP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00251
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
2 Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing. The Court will schedule oral argument at a date and time mutually convenient to the Court and the parties. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (tcs)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Oral Argument/Hearing filed by COASTAL PAWN SHOP. (KELLY, NANCY)
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. ROBINSON on behalf of COASTAL PAWN SHOP (ROBINSON, JOHN)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Oral Argument/Hearing filed by SHANTEL L BAKER, TERRY R BAKER. Reply due by 7/26/2019. (TZOVARRAS, HUNTER)
July 12, 2019 Reset Response Deadline as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Oral Argument/Hearing Pursuant to Order at ECF 15: Responses due by 7/12/2019. (tcs)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Time is extended to July 12, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS by SHANTEL L BAKER, TERRY R BAKER Responses due by 8/1/2019. (TZOVARRAS, HUNTER)
July 5, 2019 Set Deadlines Regarding Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice : Attorney John J. Robinson shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 7/12/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jwr)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John J. Robinson filed by NANCY KELLY on behalf of COASTAL PAWN SHOP (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2044333.) (KELLY, NANCY)
June 25, 2019 Case Reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. The referral judge on this case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge John H. Rich III to Magistrate Judge John C. Nivison. Judge John A. Woodcock, Jr. remains the presiding judge on the case. (sfw)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III recused. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (sfw)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by NICHOLAS GOODMAN.(WALL, JOHN)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Oral Argument : This docket entry was modified to add MOTION for Oral Argument as it was included within the motion. (sfw)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Oral Argument by COASTAL PAWN SHOP Responses due by 7/11/2019. (KELLY, NANCY). Added MOTION for Oral Argument on 6/20/2019 (sfw).
June 13, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline Regarding Notice of Removal for COASTAL PAWN SHOP Per Order #8: Answer due by 6/24/2019. (sfw)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting without objection #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Coastal Pawn Shop (the parties shall be responsible for making any name correction that may be necessary) shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint by June 24, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by COASTAL PAWN SHOP. (KELLY, NANCY)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Response to Complaint by COASTAL PAWN SHOP Responses due by 7/5/2019. (KELLY, NANCY)
June 10, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for NICHOLAS GOODMAN Per Order #5: Answer due by 6/24/2019. (sfw)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting without objection #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Nicholas Goodman shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint by June 24, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
June 10, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/13/2019 from COASTAL PAWN SHOP. (sfw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #3 State Court Record,, Exhibit 3 - Complaint by NICHOLAS GOODMAN Responses due by 7/1/2019. (WALL, JOHN)
June 4, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for Coastal Pawn Shop per State Court order: Answer due by 6/13/2019. (bfa)
June 4, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/11/2019. (bfa)
June 4, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for NICHOLAS GOODMAN, COASTAL PAWN SHOP : Answer due by 6/10/2019. (bfa)
June 4, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2029326.), filed by NICHOLAS GOODMAN.(WALL, JOHN)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by NICHOLAS GOODMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - docket sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - summary sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - entry of appearance, #5 Exhibit 5 - Coastal Pawn Shop summons, #6 Exhibit 6 - Goodman acknowledgment, #7 Exhibit 7 - Goodman's motion to enlarge time, #8 Exhibit 8 - Coastal Pawn Shop's motion to enlarge time, #9 Exhibit 9 - order on Goodman's motion, #10 Exhibit 10 - order on Coastal Pawn Shop's motion)(bfa)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number 19-CV-46. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by NICHOLAS GOODMAN. (Service of Process Deadline 9/3/2019) Fee due by 6/5/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAKER et al v. GOODMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANTEL L BAKER
Represented By: HUNTER J. TZOVARRAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY R BAKER
Represented By: HUNTER J. TZOVARRAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COASTAL PAWN SHOP
Represented By: NANCY KELLY
Represented By: JOHN J. ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?