CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK v. SARAH HOLLOWAY M/V et al

Plaintiff: CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK
Defendant: THOMAS M CHAPPELL and SARAH HOLLOWAY M/V
Not Yet Classified: ROCKPORT MARINE INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00259
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:31325
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #23 MOTION for Order Confirming Sale Hearing set for 8/9/2019 10:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 1 before JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK JR. (tcs)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER IN RESPECT TO PENDING MOTIONS, Set Deadlines as to #23 MOTION for Order Confirming Sale, Responses due by 8/7/2019 By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (tcs) Modified on 7/24/2019 to change title from "ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION" to "ORDER IN RESPECT TO PENDING MOTIONS"(tcs).
July 22, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATED Proposed Order in Respect to Pending Motions by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK. (CRESWELL, RANDY) Modified on 7/24/2019 to change title form "STIPULATION" to "Stipulated Proposed Order in Respect to Pending Motions (tcs).
July 22, 2019 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR: Motion Hearing held re #19 MOTION for Expedited Responses filed by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK. Counsel to file stipulation re deadlines suggested and approved at hearing held on 7/22/2019 forthwith. (Court Reporter: Dennis Ford) (tcs)
July 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by RANDY J. CRESWELL on behalf of CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK (CRESWELL, RANDY)
July 18, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Stefan P. Keenan filed by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SAVASUK, MICHAEL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION for Oral Argument/Hearing and MOTION for Expedited Responses filed by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK. (SAVASUK, MICHAEL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Michael X. Savasuk filed by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SAVASUK, MICHAEL) Modified on 7/17/2019 to remove duplicative text(tcs).
July 17, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Order Confirming Sale by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK Responses due by 8/7/2019. (SAVASUK, MICHAEL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing:Oral Argument set for 7/22/2019 at 10:30 AM in Portland Courtroom 3 before JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK JR. (tcs)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #19 Motion for Expedited Hearing; Motion for Expedited Responses. The Court DEFERS action on the Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Hearing and Responses (ECF No. 19). The Court scheduled this case for oral argument on Monday, July 22, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. at which time the Court will hear argument from counsel on all pending motions. SO ORDERED. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (tcs)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Oral Argument/Hearing and MOTION for Expedited Responses filed by THOMAS M CHAPPELL. Reply due by 7/31/2019. (MANHEIMER, JACOB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Expedited Hearing and MOTION for Expedited Responses by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK Responses due by 8/6/2019. (SAVASUK, MICHAEL). Added MOTION to Expedite Response on 7/17/2019 (tcs).
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM H. WELTE on behalf of ROCKPORT MARINE, INC. (WELTE, WILLIAM)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Order Specifying Form of Advertisement By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JUDGMENT It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for attorney's fees shall be filed within the time specified in Local Rule 54.2 of this Court. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion for Judgment Along with Agreement for the Issuance of a Warrant of Arrest and Order of Sale By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF SALE granting #8 Motion for Order of Sale Pursuant to Rule E (9/10) By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN PURSUANT TO RULE E(4) OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL RULES FOR CERTAIN ADMIRALTY AND MARITIME CLAIMS granting #6 Motion to Appoint Custodian By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WARRANT AND ORDER FOR ARREST OF THE M/V SARAH HOLLOWAY, HER GEAR, FITTINGS, APPURTENANCES, AND ENGINES granting #5 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to THOMAS M CHAPPELL served on 6/10/2019. (SAVASUK, MICHAEL) Modified on 6/10/2019 to correct served on date to be 6/10/2019(sfw).
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK re #7 Motion for Judgment . Main Document: Proposed Judgment. (SAVASUK, MICHAEL)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Order Specifying Form of Advertisement by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK Responses due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Legal Notice)(SAVASUK, MICHAEL)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Order of Sale Pursuant to Rule E (9/10) by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK Responses due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Auction Marketing Proposal, #2 Text of Proposed Order of Sale, #3 Exhibit to Proposed Order)(SAVASUK, MICHAEL) Modified on 6/10/2019 to remove duplicative text (sfw).
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Judgment Along with Agreement for the Issuance of a Warrant of Arrest and Order of Sale by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK Responses due by 7/1/2019. (SAVASUK, MICHAEL)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK Responses due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Samuel Temple, #2 Text of Proposed Order Appointing Substitute Custodian)(SAVASUK, MICHAEL)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK Responses due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Warrant and Order)(SAVASUK, MICHAEL) Modified on 6/10/2019 to remove duplicative text (sfw).
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JACOB A. MANHEIMER on behalf of All Defendants (MANHEIMER, JACOB)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SARAH HOLLOWAY M/V. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
June 7, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2031487.), filed by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK.(SAVASUK, MICHAEL)
June 6, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/13/2019. (bfa)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THOMAS M CHAPPELL, SARAH HOLLOWAY M/V PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK. (Service of Process Deadline 9/4/2019) Fee due by 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Preferred Ship Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B - Promissory Note)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK v. SARAH HOLLOWAY M/V et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS M CHAPPELL
Represented By: JACOB A. MANHEIMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH HOLLOWAY M/V
Represented By: JACOB A. MANHEIMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK
Represented By: MICHAEL X. SAVASUK
Represented By: RANDY J. CRESWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ROCKPORT MARINE INC
Represented By: WILLIAM H. WELTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?