DOCAMPO v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC et al
Plaintiff: MARIA DOCAMPO
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, TD BANK NA and EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00260
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/19/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 12/26/2019. Motions due by 1/9/2020. Ready for Trial on 3/2/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (akr)
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC.(BREWSTER, SETH)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Counsel having advised the Court on 7/29/2019 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement between the Plaintiff and EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter between the Plaintiff and EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 8/28/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Amy Rydzewski (akr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement Between Plaintiff And Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC ONLY by MARIA DOCAMPO (MOLLEUR, JAMES)
July 17, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC : Answer due by 8/1/2019. (akr)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting without objection #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Experian shall respond to the plaintiff's amended complaint by August 1, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement by TD BANK NA (HAYDEN, MICHAEL)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by TD BANK NA.(HAYDEN, MICHAEL)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. (WERTHEIMER, RACHEL)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC.(WERTHEIMER, RACHEL)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint, by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC Responses due by 8/5/2019. (BREWSTER, SETH)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC. (BREWSTER, SETH)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH W. BREWSTER on behalf of EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC (BREWSTER, SETH)
July 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to TD BANK NA on 8/8/2019. (akr) Modified on 7/16/2019 to remove Equifax and Experian(akr).
July 5, 2019 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default for TD BANK NA on 8/5/2019. (slg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC, TD BANK NA, filed by MARIA DOCAMPO. (Service of Process Deadline 9/30/2019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Statement of Claim, #2 Exhibit B_2018 09 04_Small Claims Judgment, #3 Exhibit C_2018 10 15 Target Settlement Offer, #4 Exhibit D_2019 03 22_Target response to dispute)(MOLLEUR, JAMES)
June 25, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC and EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC: Answers due by 7/9/2019. (tcs)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARIA DOCAMPO. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC served on 6/18/2019. (MOLLEUR, JAMES)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARIA DOCAMPO. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC served on 6/18/2019. (MOLLEUR, JAMES)
June 17, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TD BANK NA : Answer due by 7/3/2019. (tcs)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARIA DOCAMPO. TD BANK NA served on 6/12/2019. (MOLLEUR, JAMES)
June 11, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2032951.), filed by MARIA DOCAMPO.(MOLLEUR, JAMES)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC, TD BANK NA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Experian Information Solutions, Inc summons, #2 TD Bank NA)(bfa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC, TD BANK NA with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MARIA DOCAMPO. (Service of Process Deadline 9/5/2019) Fee due by 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - statement of claim, #2 Exhibit B - small claims judgment, #3 Exhibit C - Target settlement offer, #4 Exhibit D - Target response to dispute)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOCAMPO v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC
Represented By: RACHEL M. WERTHEIMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD BANK NA
Represented By: MICHAEL H. HAYDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: SETH W. BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA DOCAMPO
Represented By: JAMES F. MOLLEUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?