INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO v. CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC et al
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS ENTERPRISE SERVICES INC and CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF VERMONT COMPANY LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00265
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying #39 Motion to Extend Time To File Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Modify The Bond - By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Extend Time Motion To Extend Deadline To File Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Modify The Bond by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO Responses due by 8/30/2019. (HYKEL, JAMES)
August 7, 2019 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO. (HYKEL, JAMES)
August 5, 2019 Filing 37 Court Exhibit List from the Re-Opened Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 8/5/2019 (Exhibits listed on the Court Exhibit List are not remotely electronically available). (mnw)
August 5, 2019 Filing 36 Court Witness List from the Re-Opened Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 8/5/2019. (mnw)
August 5, 2019 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Re-Opened Preliminary Injunction Hearing held re #17 MOTION to Dissolve or Modify the TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Set Deadlines: Status Report on arbitration due by 8/9/2019. Plaintiff's Response to the Defendants' Brief Regarding Setting of Bond due by 8/19/2019. (Court Reporter: Dennis Ford) (mnw)
August 5, 2019 Filing 34 BRIEF REGARDING SETTING OF BOND by CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS ENTERPRISE SERVICES INC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF VERMONT COMPANY LLC. (FRANCO, MARK)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting #32 Motion for Confidentiality Order By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
July 31, 2019 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS ENTERPRISE SERVICES INC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF VERMONT COMPANY LLC Responses due by 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Confidentiality Order)(ROGERS, AMBER)
July 3, 2019 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties by CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS ENTERPRISE SERVICES INC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF VERMONT COMPANY LLC. (ROGERS, AMBER)
July 3, 2019 Filing 30 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS ENTERPRISE SERVICES INC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF VERMONT COMPANY LLC.(ROGERS, AMBER)
June 21, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Chambers Telephone Conference held on 6-19-19 before Judge Nancy Torresen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Dennis Ford, Telephone Number: 207-831-8056. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2019. (FORD, DENNIS)
June 20, 2019 Filing Fee Received from INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO : Amount Paid: $25,000. Receipt Number: 219001208. Method of Payment: Check. Purpose of Payment: Security as directed at the Conference held on 6/19/2019. Date Paid: 6/20/2019 (lrc)
June 20, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO. CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS ENTERPRISE SERVICES INC served on 6/13/2019. (O'CONNELL, ALFRED)
June 20, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO. CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF VERMONT COMPANY LLC served on 6/13/2019. (O'CONNELL, ALFRED)
June 20, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO. CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC served on 6/13/2019. (O'CONNELL, ALFRED)
June 19, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2019 10:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 2 before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (clp)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Oral ORDER requiring the plaintiff to post security in the amount of $25,000.00 By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (jwr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN: Telephone Conference held. The Court will reopen the Preliminary Injunction Hearing and the matter will be scheduled for hearing after the week of July 22nd. Parties are to meet and confer regarding discovery and should the parties be unable to agree they are to schedule a hearing with the Magistrate Judge immediately. The court instructed the plaintiff to post security in the amount of $25,000. (Court Reporter: FTR) (jwr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 Transcript Errata Sheet Re: #21 Transcript,,, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2019. (FORD, DENNIS)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held on 6-13-19 before Judge Nancy Torresen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Dennis Ford, Telephone Number: 207-831-8056. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2019. (FORD, DENNIS) Modified on 6/19/2019 to correct date of hearing to be 6/13/19 per errata sheet #22 (clp).
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dissolve or Modify the TRO and Preliminary Injunction filed by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO. Reply due by 7/2/2019. (GORDON O'CONNELL, ALFRED)
June 18, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney David C. Lonergan shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 6/25/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Lonergan, Esq. filed by MARK V. FRANCO on behalf of CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS ENTERPRISE SERVICES INC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF VERMONT COMPANY LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2035812.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of David Lonergan, Esq.)(FRANCO, MARK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 1:30 PM before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Counsel shall coordinate amongst themselves who can initiate the conference call. (mnw)
June 17, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dissolve or Modify the TRO and Preliminary Injunction : Per U.S. District Judge Nancy Torresen - Response due by 5:00 p.m. on 6/18/2019. (mnw)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF REGARDING PROPRIETY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MOTION TO DISSOLVE OR MODIFY THE TRO AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS ENTERPRISE SERVICES INC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF VERMONT COMPANY LLC. (FRANCO, MARK) Modified on 6/17/2019 to add Motion to Dissolve or Modify the TRO and Preliminary Injunction (mnw).
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED Court Exhibit List from Hearing on Motion for TRO and/or PI held on 6/13/19 (Exhibits listed on the Court Exhibit List are not remotely electronically available). (slg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 Court Witness List from Hearing re ECF #7 Motion for TRO and/or PI held on 6/13/19. (slg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 Court Exhibit List from Hearing re ECF #7 Motion for TRO and/or PI held on 6/13/19 (Exhibits listed on the Court Exhibit List are not remotely electronically available). (slg)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Oral ORDER granting #6 Motion for TRO; granting #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction - for reasons stated on the record. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mjlt)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN: Motion Hearing held re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO. (Court Reporter: Dennis Ford) (mjlt)
June 13, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney Amber Rogers shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 6/17/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (clp)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amber Rogers filed by MARK V. FRANCO on behalf of All Defendants (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2034686.) (Attachments: #1 Motion to Admit Amber Rogers Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A: Affidavit of Amber Rogers)(FRANCO, MARK)
June 13, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney Donna Butler shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 6/17/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (clp)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS ENTERPRISE SERVICES INC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF VERMONT COMPANY LLC. Reply due by 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Whitlock)(FRANCO, MARK) Modified on 6/13/2019 to clean up docket text (mjlt).
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donna M. Butler filed by MARK V. FRANCO on behalf of All Defendants (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2034601.) (Attachments: #1 Motion to Admit Donna Butler Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A: Affidavit of Donna M. Butler)(FRANCO, MARK)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK V. FRANCO on behalf of All Defendants (FRANCO, MARK)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction: Conference/Hearing set for 6/13/2019 at 03:00 PM in Portland Courtroom 1 before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (slg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO Responses due by 7/3/2019. (HYKEL, JAMES). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 6/13/2019 (mjlt). Modified on 6/19/2019 to re-open Preliminary Injunction portion of this motion in accordance with the telephone conference held this date before Judge Torresen (clp).
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS ENTERPRISE SERVICES INC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF VERMONT COMPANY LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Consolidated Communications of Vermont Company LLC summons, #2 Consolidated Communications Enterprise Services, Inc summons)(bfa)
June 12, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney Alfred Gordon O'Connell shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 6/19/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw)
June 11, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2033474.), filed by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO.(HYKEL, JAMES)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alfred Gordon O'Connell filed by JAMES HYKEL on behalf of INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2033471.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(HYKEL, JAMES)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS ENTERPRISE SERVICES INC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC, CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF VERMONT COMPANY LLC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO. (Service of Process Deadline 9/9/2019) Fee due by 6/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Peter J. McLaughlin, #2 Exhibit B - Chapter 289, #3 Exhibit C - Chapter 290, #4 Exhibit 1 - CBA 2015 - 2018, #5 Exhibit 2 - IBEW All Inclusive Comprehensive Proposal 8.4.18, #6 Exhibit 3 - surplus declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 - confidentiality agreement, #8 Exhibit 5 grievance)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO v. CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC
Represented By: DONNA M. BUTLER
Represented By: DAVID C. LONERGAN
Represented By: AMBER M. ROGERS
Represented By: MARK V. FRANCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS ENTERPRISE SERVICES INC
Represented By: DONNA M. BUTLER
Represented By: DAVID C. LONERGAN
Represented By: AMBER M. ROGERS
Represented By: MARK V. FRANCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF VERMONT COMPANY LLC
Represented By: DONNA M. BUTLER
Represented By: DAVID C. LONERGAN
Represented By: AMBER M. ROGERS
Represented By: MARK V. FRANCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO
Represented By: JAMES HYKEL
Represented By: ALFRED GORDON O'CONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?