FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. CAMPBELL

Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Defendant: DEBORAH E CAMPBELL
Interested Party: ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00272
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : ORAL ARGUMENT set for 8/21/2019 11:30 AM in Portland Courtroom 2 before JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (clp)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA. (DIONNE, JASON)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (LOWN, BRADLEY)
July 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION : Per Local Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/1/2019. (clp)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION by DEBORAH E CAMPBELL.(DIONNE, JASON)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. Reply due by 8/5/2019. (LOWN, BRADLEY)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties by ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA (DIONNE, JASON)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA Responses due by 8/5/2019. (DIONNE, JASON)
July 8, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for DEBORAH E CAMPBELL per summons returned executed 7/3/19: Answer due by 7/24/2019. (clp)
July 8, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA. Summons returned executed 6/25/19: Answer due by 7/16/2019. (clp)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. DEBORAH E CAMPBELL served on 7/3/2019. (LOWN, BRADLEY)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA served on 6/25/2019. (LOWN, BRADLEY)
June 19, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2037008.), filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION.(LOWN, BRADLEY)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DEBORAH E CAMPBELL, ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Isaacson & Raymond, PA summons)(bfa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEBORAH E CAMPBELL PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 9/11/2019) Fee due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - warranty deed, #2 Exhibit B - disclosure form, #3 Exhibit C - note, #4 Exhibit D - mortgage, #5 Exhibit E - assignment into FNMA, #6 Exhibit F - settlement agreement, #7 Exhibit G - abstract of divorce judgment, #8 Exhibit H - 6/3/13 ownership letter and deed, #9 Exhibit I - 6/3/13 load modification request, #10 Exhibit J - release deed, #11 Exhibit K - loan modification, #12 Exhibit L - 8/4/14 fax, #13 Exhibit M - 1/26/16 fax, #14 Exhibit N - P$S agreement, #15 Exhibit O - 9/20/17 Seterus letter, #16 Exhibit P - closing disclosure, #17 Exhibit Q - quitclaim deed, #18 Exhibit R - 4/13/18 request for loan modification, #19 Exhibit S - 5/10/18 Seterus correspondence, #20 Exhibit T - 5/14/18 letter, #21 Exhibit U - 7/20/18 correspondence, #22 Exhibit V - 7/31/18 correspondence, #23 Exhibit W - payoff quote)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: BRADLEY M. LOWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA
Represented By: JASON DIONNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH E CAMPBELL
Represented By: JASON DIONNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?