UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $59,000 IN US CURRENCY et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $59,000 IN US CURRENCY, 1966 CHEVROLET MALIBU COUPE SS 396 and 2018 GMC SIERRA DENALI
Case Number: 2:2019cv00281
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (CLARK, DONALD)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #1 Complaint, : This docket entry was modified by the Clerk's Office to change the defendant from $15,000 US Currency to $59,000 US Currency. (mjlt)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mjlt)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $59,000 IN US CURRENCY, 1966 CHEVROLET MALIBU COUPE SS 396, 2018 GMC SIERRA DENALI, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 9/12/2019)(mjlt) Modified on 6/20/2019 to change the defendant from $15,000 US Currency to $59,000 US Currency (mjlt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $59,000 IN US CURRENCY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $59,000 IN US CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1966 CHEVROLET MALIBU COUPE SS 396
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2018 GMC SIERRA DENALI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: DONALD E. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?