FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. VALERIANI
Plaintiff: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER J VALERIANI
Case Number: 2:2019cv00284
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 8/21/2019. (akr)
July 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for CHRISTOPHER J VALERIANI : Answer due by 7/22/2019. (akr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. CHRISTOPHER J VALERIANI served on 7/1/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 24, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2038694.), filed by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 21, 2019 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION by 6/28/2019. (slg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CHRISTOPHER J VALERIANI. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHRISTOPHER J VALERIANI, filed by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 9/18/2019) Fee due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment into Freedom, #5 Exhibit E - 2011 Loan Modification, #6 Exhibit F - 2017 Loan Modification, #7 Exhibit G - Demand Letter, #8 Exhibit H - Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. VALERIANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER J VALERIANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?