HALE v. OWL COMPANIES et al
Plaintiff: BRIDGET HALE
Defendant: FLUOR CORPORATION, OWL COMPANIES, DEL-JEN INC, CAREER SYSTEMS DEVELOPMENT CORP, CHP INTERNATIONAL INC and US DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Case Number: 2:2019cv00287
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for OWL COMPANIES and CAREER SYSTEMS DEVELOPMENT CORP per Filing of Amended Complaint: Answer to Amended Complaint due by 8/26/2019. (lrc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Request for Jury Trial against OWL COMPANIES, filed by BRIDGET HALE. (Service of Process Deadline 11/5/2019)(QUINN, FRANCIS)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by BRIDGET HALE as to Del-Jen and Fluor (QUINN, FRANCIS)
July 10, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for OWL COMPANIES, DEL-JEN INC, CAREER SYSTEMS DEVELOPMENT CORP, FLUOR CORPORATION : Answer due by 8/12/2019. (akr)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting without objection #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All defendants' deadline to respond to the plaintiff's complaint is enlarged to August 12, 2019 (August 11 being a Sunday). By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer for all Defendants to Answer by DEL-JEN INC, FLUOR CORPORATION Responses due by 7/31/2019. (WHITMAN, JOHN)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OWL COMPANIES. (DENHAM, ALISON)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CAREER SYSTEMS DEVELOPMENT CORP. (DENHAM, ALISON)
June 24, 2019 Filing Fee Received from CAREER SYSTEMS DEVELOPMENT CORP, OWL COMPANIES: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 219001227. Method of Payment: check. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 6/24/2019 re #1 Notice of Removal. (bfa)
June 24, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for OWL COMPANIES, DEL-JEN INC, CAREER SYSTEMS DEVELOPMENT CORP, FLUOR CORPORATION : Answer due by 7/12/2019. (sfw)
June 24, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/28/2019 from OWL COMPANIES, CAREER SYSTEMS DEVELOPMENT CORP. (sfw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FLUOR CORPORATION. (sfw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DEL-JEN INC. (sfw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN S. WHITMAN on behalf of DEL-JEN INC, FLUOR CORPORATION (sfw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Defendants DEL-JEN INC, FLUOR CORPORATION with State Court Pleadings Complaint from YORK COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number ALFSC-CV-2019-00098. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FLUOR CORPORATION, DEL-JEN INC. (Service of Process Deadline 9/19/2019) Fee due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Complaint ALFSC-CV-2019-00098)(sfw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISON DENHAM on behalf of CAREER SYSTEMS DEVELOPMENT CORP, OWL COMPANIES (sfw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by CAREER SYSTEMS DEVELOPMENT CORP, OWL COMPANIES. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet ALFSC-CV-2019-00098, #2 Summary Sheet ALFSC-CV-2019-00098, #3 Complaint ALFSC-CV-2019-00098, #4 Summons as to Owl Companies, #5 Acknowledgement of Receipt of Summons and Complaint Owl Companies, #6 Summons as to Career Systems Development Corp, #7 Acknowledgement of Receipt of Summons and Complaint Career Systems Development Corp)(sfw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants Owl Companies, Career Systems Development Corp with State Court Pleadings COMPLAINT, SUMMONS as to Defendants Owl Companies, Career Systems Development Corp, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS as to Defendants Owl Companies, Career Systems Development Corp from YORK COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number ALFSC-CV-2019-00098. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by OWL COMPANIES, CAREER SYSTEMS DEVELOPMENT CORP. (Service of Process Deadline 9/19/2019) Fee due by 6/24/2019.(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALE v. OWL COMPANIES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN S. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWL COMPANIES
Represented By: ALISON DENHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEL-JEN INC
Represented By: JOHN S. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREER SYSTEMS DEVELOPMENT CORP
Represented By: ALISON DENHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHP INTERNATIONAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIDGET HALE
Represented By: FRANCIS X. QUINN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?