FERENCEI v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: MILAN FERENCEI and JENNIFER GOSETTI
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00288
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by MILAN FERENCEI. (Service of Process Deadline 9/24/2019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MURPHY, DANIEL)
June 25, 2019 Filing Fee Received from MILAN FERENCEI: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 0100-2039454. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 6/25/2019 (lrc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MILAN FERENCEI. (Service of Process Deadline 9/19/2019) Fee due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A IRS denial and mail receipts)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FERENCEI v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILAN FERENCEI
Represented By: DANIEL J. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER GOSETTI
Represented By: DANIEL J. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?