STOCKFOOD AMERICA INC v. GIZMODO MEDIA GROUP LLC
Plaintiff: STOCKFOOD AMERICA INC
Defendant: GIZMODO MEDIA GROUP LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00293
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for GIZMODO MEDIA GROUP LLC Per filing of #7 Affidavit of Service: Answer due by 9/9/2019. (slg)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by STOCKFOOD AMERICA INC. GIZMODO MEDIA GROUP LLC served on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Email strand regarding service, #2 Exhibit B - Email strand between counsel regarding accepting service)(SCHOWALTER, MICHAEL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; copy e-mailed to U.S Copyright Office. (sfw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by STOCKFOOD AMERICA INC. (SCHOWALTER, MICHAEL)
June 26, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/3/2019 from STOCKFOOD AMERICA INC. (sfw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; copy e-mailed to U.S Copyright Office. (sfw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GIZMODO MEDIA GROUP LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (sfw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
June 26, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2040176.), filed by STOCKFOOD AMERICA INC.(SCHOWALTER, MICHAEL)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GIZMODO MEDIA GROUP LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by STOCKFOOD AMERICA INC. (Service of Process Deadline 9/24/2019) Fee due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint: Photo, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint: Certificate of Registration, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint: Screenshots)(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STOCKFOOD AMERICA INC v. GIZMODO MEDIA GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIZMODO MEDIA GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STOCKFOOD AMERICA INC
Represented By: MICHAEL JOHN SCHOWALTER, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?