CONANT et al v. FMC CORPORATION

Plaintiff: THOMAS AMES, RODNEY MASON, TODD CONANT, GREGORY GOULD and KAREN MIGLIORE
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00296
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 10/3/2019 08:30 AM in Portland Bankruptcy Court before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON, In Camera Settlement Papers due by 9/26/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Telephone Conference held re: scheduling order. Report to issue. (Court Reporter: Melissa Merenberg) (jwr)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by THOMAS AMES, TODD CONANT, GREGORY GOULD, RODNEY MASON, KAREN MIGLIORE. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 11:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. The parties have been provided with the Court's call-in information. (MFS)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brooks is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by VALERIE Z. WICKS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WICKS, VALERIE)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Attorney Max I. Brooks to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiffs by THOMAS AMES, TODD CONANT, GREGORY GOULD, RODNEY MASON, KAREN MIGLIORE Responses due by 7/30/2019. (BROOKS, MAX)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by FMC CORPORATION.(MCCARTHY, GAVIN)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FMC CORPORATION. (MCCARTHY, GAVIN)
June 28, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement for FMC CORPORATION due by 7/5/2019. (tcs)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by GAVIN G. MCCARTHY, MARGARET C. LEPAGE, JOSHUA D. DUNLAP, MATTHEW ALTIERI on behalf of FMC CORPORATION (MCCARTHY, GAVIN) Modified on 6/28/2019 to include names all counsel (tcs).
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by FMC CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Docket Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acknowledgement of Receipt of Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter to Clerk re Acknowledgement of Receipt of Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Civil Summary Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter to Clerk re Complaint and Civil Summary Sheet)(KAYATTA, KATHERINE)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 7/5/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Susan Way. (sfw)
June 27, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for FMC CORPORATION : Answer due by 7/3/2019. (sfw)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #1 Notice of Removal : This docket entry was modified to indicate that FMC CORPORATION is the correct filer. (sfw)
June 27, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2040651.), filed by FMC CORPORATION.(KAYATTA, KATHERINE)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings Complaint, Summons from KNOX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number CV-1908. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FMC CORPORATION (Service of Process Deadline 9/24/2019) Fee due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1: Complaint, #2 Exhibit A2: Summons, #3 Exhibit B: Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint)(sfw) Modified on 6/27/2019 to indicate FMC CORPORATION is the correct filer (sfw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONANT et al v. FMC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS AMES
Represented By: CAROL GARVAN
Represented By: MAX I. BROOKS
Represented By: DAVID G. WEBBERT
Represented By: VALERIE Z. WICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY MASON
Represented By: CAROL GARVAN
Represented By: MAX I. BROOKS
Represented By: DAVID G. WEBBERT
Represented By: VALERIE Z. WICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD CONANT
Represented By: CAROL GARVAN
Represented By: MAX I. BROOKS
Represented By: DAVID G. WEBBERT
Represented By: VALERIE Z. WICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY GOULD
Represented By: CAROL GARVAN
Represented By: MAX I. BROOKS
Represented By: DAVID G. WEBBERT
Represented By: VALERIE Z. WICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN MIGLIORE
Represented By: CAROL GARVAN
Represented By: MAX I. BROOKS
Represented By: DAVID G. WEBBERT
Represented By: VALERIE Z. WICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Represented By: KATHERINE S. KAYATTA
Represented By: MARGARET C. LEPAGE
Represented By: JOSHUA D. DUNLAP
Represented By: MATTHEW ALTIERI
Represented By: GAVIN G. MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?