US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. CUNNINGHAM et al
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Defendant: AARON CUNNINGHAM and LISA CUNNINGHAM
Interested Party: MAINE REVENUE SERVICES and MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2019cv00306
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to AARON CUNNINGHAM on 9/3/2019. (tcs)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #10 Summons Returned Executed : indicate it is a duplicate entry of Docket Entry No. 9. (tcs)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 7/9/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 8/1/2019 to indicate duplicate entry (tcs).
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST as to LISA CUNNINGHAM served on 7/8/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 8/1/2019 to remove duplicate summons returned executed event from text(tcs). Modified on 8/1/2019 (tcs).
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. AARON CUNNINGHAM served on 7/6/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER G. HUSTON on behalf of MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (HUSTON, JENNIFER)
July 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Support Lien, #2 Exhibit Agent Affidavit)(HUSTON, JENNIFER)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LISA CUNNINGHAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(tcs)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 1, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2042694.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 1, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/8/2019. (bfa)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AARON CUNNINGHAM, LISA CUNNINGHAM, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Aaron Cunningham summons, #2 Maine Department of Health and Human Services summons, #3 Maine Revenue Services summons)(bfa)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AARON CUNNINGHAM, LISA CUNNINGHAM PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 9/30/2019) Fee due by 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D AOM to BOA, #5 Exhibit E AOM to FNMA, #6 Exhibit F Loan Modification Agreement, #7 Exhibit G Quitclaim AOM to FNMA, #8 Exhibit H AOM to US Bank, #9 Exhibit I Demand Letter, #10 Exhibit J Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. CUNNINGHAM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: JENNIFER G. HUSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?