SMITH v. SMITH et al
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH H SMITH
Defendant: CYNTHIA W SMITH, ROBERT P SMTIH and ROBERT P SMITH
Case Number: 2:2019cv00310
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for attorney's fees shall be filed within the time specified in Local Rule 54.2 of this Court. By DEPUTY CLERK: Lindsey Caron. (lrc)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE #8 . By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 MAIL (Pleading #8 and NEF returned) sent to Elizabeth Smith returned as undeliverable. Reason: No Mail Receptacle. (tcs)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 MAIL (Order Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) sent to Elizabeth Smith returned as undeliverable. Reason: No Mail Receptacle. (lrc)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint, filed by ELIZABETH H SMITH. Objections to R&R due by 8/1/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Based on information Plaintiff recently filed in other matters, the Court grants the motion. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MAIL (Pro Se Appearance Form and Information for Pro Se Parties Handout) sent to Elizabeth Smith returned as undeliverable. Reason: No Mail Receptacle. (lrc)
July 2, 2019 Set Deadlines : Pro Se Appearance Form due on 7/16/2019. (lrc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties Handout (lrc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Service filed by ELIZABETH H SMITH re #2 Motion to Stay/Request for Injunctive Relief, #1 Complaint (lrc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay / Request for Injunctive Relief by ELIZABETH H SMITH (lrc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CYNTHIA W SMITH, ROBERT P SMTIH PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ELIZABETH H SMITH. (Service of Process Deadline 9/26/2019) Fee due by 7/1/2019.(lrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. SMITH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYNTHIA W SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT P SMTIH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT P SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH H SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?