BARTON et al v. VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: EDMOND GOSSELIN, ERIN MCNALLY and DERON BARTON
Defendant: BAY EQUITY LLC, VILLAGE MORTGAGE A DIVISION OF BAY EQUITY HOME LOANS, BAY EQUITY HOME LOANS, VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY and VILLAGE A DIVISION OF BAY EQUITY HOME LOANS
Case Number: 2:2019cv00318
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Attachment & Trustee Process filed by VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY. Reply due by 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Laurel Caliendo, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Tracy Schweiger)(OLFENE, AMY)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/22/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 1/29/2020. Motions due by 2/12/2020. Ready for Trial on 4/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY.(OLFENE, AMY)
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by BAY EQUITY LLC.(CATERINE, MELINDA)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gary J. Lieberman filed by MELINDA J. CATERINE on behalf of BAY EQUITY LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2069807.) (CATERINE, MELINDA)
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Attachment & Trustee Process by DERON BARTON, EDMOND GOSSELIN, ERIN MCNALLY Responses due by 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel - Michael T. Devine, #2 Affidavit of Erin McNally, #3 Exhibit 1 to McNally Affidavit - Village 1/2/18 Offer of Employment, #4 Affidavit of Edmond Gosselin, #5 Exhibit 1 to Gosselin Affidavit - Village 10/12/18 Offer of Employment, #6 Exhibit 2 to Gosselin Affidavit - Loan Originator Compensation Agreement, #7 Affidavit of Deron Barton, #8 Exhibit 1 to Barton Affidavit - Village 12/27/17 Offer of Employment, #9 Exhibit 2 to Barton Affidavit - Loan Originator Compensation Agreement)(DEVINE, MICHAEL)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion of Steven J. Silver to Withdraw as Attorney. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Attorney Steven J. Silver to Withdraw as Attorney by BAY EQUITY LLC Responses due by 9/3/2019. (SILVER, STEVEN)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BAY EQUITY LLC, VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY, filed by DERON BARTON, EDMOND GOSSELIN, ERIN MCNALLY. (Service of Process Deadline 11/12/2019)(DEVINE, MICHAEL)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MELINDA J. CATERINE on behalf of BAY EQUITY LLC (CATERINE, MELINDA)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY T. HOWE on behalf of VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY (HOWE, EMILY)
July 31, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY per Order No. 12: Answer due by 9/3/2019. (lrc)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to September 3, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY Responses due by 8/20/2019. (OLFENE, AMY)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY. (OLFENE, AMY)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY K. OLFENE on behalf of VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY (OLFENE, AMY)
July 26, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for BAY EQUITY LLC per Order #8: Answer due by 9/3/2019. (slg)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to September 3, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BAY EQUITY LLC. (SILVER, STEVEN)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by BAY EQUITY LLC Responses due by 8/15/2019. (SILVER, STEVEN)
July 17, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for BAY EQUITY LLC Per Summons Returned Executed filed on 7/17/2019: Answer due by 8/2/2019. (lrc)
July 17, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY Per Summons Returned Executed filed on 7/17/2019: Answer due by 8/1/2019. (lrc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DERON BARTON, EDMOND GOSSELIN, ERIN MCNALLY. VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY served on 7/11/2019. (DEVINE, MICHAEL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DERON BARTON, EDMOND GOSSELIN, ERIN MCNALLY. BAY EQUITY LLC served on 7/12/2019. (DEVINE, MICHAEL)
July 9, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2045681.), filed by DERON BARTON, EDMOND GOSSELIN, ERIN MCNALLY.(DEVINE, MICHAEL)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BAY EQUITY LLC, VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY summons)(bfa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BAY EQUITY LLC, VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by DERON BARTON, EDMOND GOSSELIN, ERIN MCNALLY. (Service of Process Deadline 10/7/2019) Fee due by 7/11/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARTON et al v. VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAY EQUITY LLC
Represented By: GARY J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: MELINDA J. CATERINE
Represented By: STEVEN J. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VILLAGE MORTGAGE A DIVISION OF BAY EQUITY HOME LOANS
Represented By: GARY J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: MELINDA J. CATERINE
Represented By: STEVEN J. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAY EQUITY HOME LOANS
Represented By: GARY J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: MELINDA J. CATERINE
Represented By: STEVEN J. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY
Represented By: AMY K. OLFENE
Represented By: EMILY T. HOWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VILLAGE A DIVISION OF BAY EQUITY HOME LOANS
Represented By: GARY J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: MELINDA J. CATERINE
Represented By: STEVEN J. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDMOND GOSSELIN
Represented By: MICHAEL T. DEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN MCNALLY
Represented By: MICHAEL T. DEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERON BARTON
Represented By: MICHAEL T. DEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?