KEHOE v. GRADY et al
Petitioner: ANNE MARIE KEHOE
Respondent: CHARLIE UNKNOWN, CLAIRE M GRADY and DONALD TRUMP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00321
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
2 Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by ANNE MARIE KEHOE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Main Document: Additional Habeas Corpus Filing. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Envelope)(mnw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by ANNE MARIE KEHOE (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mnw)
July 29, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Pro Se Appearance Form due from ANNE MARIE KEHOE by 8/5/2019. (mnw)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ANNE MARIE KEHOE. Objections to R&R due by 8/1/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerks Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (bfa)
July 11, 2019 Set Deadlines : Pro Se Appearance Form due on 7/25/2019. (bfa)
July 11, 2019 Filing Fee Received from ANNE MARIE KEHOE: Amount Paid: $5.00. Receipt Number: 219001311. Method of Payment: check. Purpose of Payment: filing fee. Date Paid: 7/10/2019 re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (bfa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ANNE MARIE KEHOE. (Attachments: #1 photo of Claire Grady, #2 photo of Donald Trump and Shanahan, #3 photo of Nielsen and Grady, #4 demand to Sheriffs, #5 cover letter, #6 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEHOE v. GRADY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANNE MARIE KEHOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHARLIE UNKNOWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CLAIRE M GRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DONALD TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?