RUSSO v. VALMET INC et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL RUSSO
Defendant: VALMET INC and VALMET INC DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN
Case Number: 2:2019cv00324
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VALMET INC, VALMET INC DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN. (CONSTANTINE, RANDALL)
August 30, 2019 Set Answer Deadlines for VALMET INC & VALMET INC DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN per Waiver of Service sent 8/23/19: Answer due by 10/22/2019. (clp)
August 30, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement as to VALMET INC & VALMENT INC DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN due by 9/6/2019. (clp)
August 30, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings : Attorneys RANDALL A. CONSTANTINE and EMILY E. FRIEDMAN shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 9/6/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (clp)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed VALMET INC DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN waiver sent on 8/23/2019. (SCOTT, K.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed VALMET INC waiver sent on 8/23/2019. (SCOTT, K.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Emily E. Friedman filed by K. JOSHUA SCOTT on behalf of VALMET INC, VALMET INC DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2071291.) (SCOTT, K.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Randall A. Constantine filed by K. JOSHUA SCOTT on behalf of VALMET INC, VALMET INC DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2071284.) (SCOTT, K.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by K. JOSHUA SCOTT on behalf of VALMET INC, VALMET INC DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN (SCOTT, K.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to VALMET INC, VALMET INC DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 VALMET INC. DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN summons)(bfa)
July 12, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2047488.), filed by MICHAEL RUSSO.(MACCOLL, EDWARD)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VALMET INC, VALMET INC DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MICHAEL RUSSO. (Service of Process Deadline 10/10/2019) Fee due by 7/15/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUSSO v. VALMET INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL RUSSO
Represented By: MARSHALL J. TINKLE
Represented By: EDWARD S. MACCOLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALMET INC
Represented By: EMILY E. FRIEDMAN
Represented By: RANDALL A. CONSTANTINE
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALMET INC DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN
Represented By: EMILY E. FRIEDMAN
Represented By: RANDALL A. CONSTANTINE
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?