FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. GAGNE et al
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Defendant: ROSS W GAGNE and CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER
Interested Party: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC AND DISCOVER BANK
Case Number: 2:2019cv00333
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 9/18/2019 as to ALL DEFENDANTS. (akr)
August 16, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 9/16/2019 as to ROSS W GAGNE and CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER. (akr)
August 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC AND DISCOVER BANK : Answer due by 8/19/2019. (akr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC AND DISCOVER BANK served on 7/29/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC AND DISCOVER BANK served on 7/30/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. ROSS W GAGNE served on 7/25/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER served on 7/22/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 19, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2051200.), filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 16, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/23/2019. (bfa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, ROSS W GAGNE, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC AND DISCOVER BANK. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Ross Gagne summons, #2 Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, #3 Discover Bank summons)(bfa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, ROSS W GAGNE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 10/15/2019) Fee due by 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D AOM to BAC, #5 Exhibit E AOM to Nationstar, #6 Exhibit F AOM to Nationstar, #7 Exhibit G AOM to Nationstar, #8 Exhibit H AOM to FNMA, #9 Exhibit I AOM to FNMA, #10 Exhibit J 2017 Loan Modification, #11 Exhibit K 2018 Loan Modification, #12 Exhibit L Demand Letter, #13 Exhibit M Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. GAGNE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSS W GAGNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC AND DISCOVER BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?