CROCKER v. CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER et al
Plaintiff: GEORGE M CROCKER, III
Defendant: CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER and CENTRAL MAINE HEALTHCARE CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00339
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/23/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 1/30/2020. Motions due by 2/13/2020. Ready for Trial on 4/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties by CENTRAL MAINE HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER (RIDEOUT, LAURA)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by CENTRAL MAINE HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER.(RIDEOUT, LAURA)
August 20, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, CENTRAL MAINE HEALTHCARE CORPORATION : Answer due by 9/5/2019. (sfw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by GEORGE M CROCKER, III. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service - CMMC)(AIELLO, KRISTIN)
July 18, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2050457.), filed by GEORGE M CROCKER, III.(RICE, PETER)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CENTRAL MAINE HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Central Maine Healthcare Corporation summons)(bfa)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTRAL MAINE HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by GEORGE M CROCKER, III. (Service of Process Deadline 10/15/2019) Fee due by 7/19/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROCKER v. CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE M CROCKER, III
Represented By: KRISTIN L. AIELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: LAURA A. RIDEOUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL MAINE HEALTHCARE CORPORATION
Represented By: LAURA A. RIDEOUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?