CITY OF ROCKLAND v. PURDUE PHARMA LP et al
Plaintiff: CITY OF ROCKLAND
Defendant: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, WALGREEN CO, PURDUE PHARMA LP, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, CVS PHARMACY INC, DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO, ALLERGAN PLC, CEPHALON INC, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, WALMART INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC, PURDUE PHARMA INC, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC, ORTHO-MCNEIL- JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ACTAVIS LLC and ACTAVIS PHARMA INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00373
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 46 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Electronic Civil Case Transfer. Case electronically transferred to Northern District of Ohio has been opened on 09/25/2019 as case 1:19-op-45823. (mlm)
September 23, 2019 Filing 45 Multidistrict Litigation (MDL)case electronically transferred to District of Ohio. (clp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 44 MDL CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (clp)
September 19, 2019 Filing 43 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (clp)
August 30, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donna M. Welch, P.C. filed by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2071558.) (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Motion by Attorneys Lester Houtz and Alex Harris to Withdraw as Attorneys. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 29, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven A. Reed filed by JEFF GOLDMAN on behalf of ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, CEPHALON INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2070945.) (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
August 29, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION by Attorney Lester C. Houtz and Alex J. Harris to Withdraw as Attorney by WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC Responses due by 9/19/2019. (CAHOON, JOSEPH)
August 27, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificates as to Attorneys STEVEN A. REED, LESTER C. HOUTZ, ALEX J. HARRIS, DONNA WELCH, JENNIFER G. LEVY, MARTIN ROTH and TIMOTHY KNAPP due by 8/30/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (clp)
August 27, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles C. Lifland filed by MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL- JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2069514.) (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE)
August 27, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Zane Watts filed by KAREN FRINK WOLF on behalf of ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2069411.) (WOLF, KAREN)
August 27, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Attorneys KELLY A. MOORE, COLEEN M. MEEHAN, LESTER C. HOUTZ, ALEX J. HARRIS, MARTIN ROTH and TIMOTHY KNAPP shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 8/30/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. Pro Hac Vice Certificates for Attorneys STEVEN A. REED, CHARLES LIFLAND, LESTER C. HOUTZ, ALEX J. HARRIS, CHRISTOPHER LOVRIEN, DONNA WELCH, JENNIFER G. LEVY, MARTIN ROTH and TIMOTHY KNAPP due by 8/30/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (clp)
August 26, 2019 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
August 26, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Cheffo filed by RITCHIE E. BERGER on behalf of PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2068859.) (BERGER, RITCHIE)
August 26, 2019 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP. (BERGER, RITCHIE)
August 26, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by RITCHIE E. BERGER on behalf of PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP (BERGER, RITCHIE)
August 23, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Madeleine K. Rodriguez filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2068336.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA)
August 23, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Geiger filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2068330.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA)
August 23, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of K. Neil Austin filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2068312.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA)
August 23, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Conor B. O'Croinin filed by GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ on behalf of CVS PHARMACY INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2068315.) (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
August 22, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC. (CAHOON, JOSEPH)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 21, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALMART INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
August 21, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah G. Conway filed by DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY on behalf of WALMART INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2066559.) (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 21, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney Conor O'Croinin Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 8/28/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (clp)
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES M. CAMPBELL on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL- JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (CAMPBELL, JAMES)
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL- JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC Responses due by 9/11/2019. (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE)
August 21, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL- JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE)
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL- JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE)
August 20, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by CVS PHARMACY INC, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, WALMART INC Responses due by 9/10/2019. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
August 20, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS PHARMACY INC. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (HANLON, MELISSA)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION re #13 State Court Record. Main Document: Docket Record. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summary Sheet, #3 Allergan Finance, LLC's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #4 Cardinal Health 110 LLC's Assented to Motion to Extend Time, #5 AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #6 AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, #7 McKesson Corp's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #8 McKesson Corp's Assented to Motion to Extend Deadline, #9 Notice of Entry of Appearance of Hanlon, #10 Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #11 Cardinal Health 110 LLC's Assented to Motion to Extend Time, #12 Entry of Appearance of Hawkins, #13 Entry of Appearance of Petruccelli, #14 Rite Aid Corp, et al.'s Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #15 Endo Health Solutions Inc, et al.'s Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #16 Order granting AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Consent Motion, #17 Order granting Cardinal Health 110 LLC's Assented to Motion, #18 Order granting McKesson Corp's Assented to Motion, #19 Walmart Inc's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #20 Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #21 Actavis LLC, et al.'s Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #22 CVS Pharmacy, Inc's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #23 Purdue Pharma Inc, et al.'s Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #24 Cieniawski and Bruehl's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #25 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Service Deadlines, #26 Entry of Appearance of Sturtevant, #27 Jorgensen's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service, #28 Bruehl and Cieniawski's Consented-to Motion to Extend to Deadline, #29 Entry of Appearance of Lavoie and Hadiaris, #30 Summons served on Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc, #31 Summons served on Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, #32 Summons served on Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, #33 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Service Deadlines, #34 Summons served on Johnson & Johnson, #35 Notice of Entry of Appearance of Sanchez)(clp)
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brien T. O'Connor and Andrew J. O'Connor filed by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number 0100-2065581.) (Attachments: #1 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Andrew J. O'Connor)(WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC. (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC. (HAWKINS, CHRISTOPHER)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, CEPHALON INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (WOLF, KAREN)
August 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION Responses due by 9/6/2019. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA)
August 16, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2064116.), filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION.(DUNLAP, JOSHUA)
August 16, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/23/2019. (bfa)
August 16, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney Martin L. Roth, Timothy W, Knapp, Lester C. Houtz, Alex A. Harris, Sarah G. Conway, Kelly A. Moore, Elisa P. Mcenroe shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 8/23/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 8/23/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (bfa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER sent to MDL Panel. (bfa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 8/23/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC. (PETRUCCELLI, GERALD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Superior Court, case number CV-19-15. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 11/13/2019) Fee due by 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - complaint pages 1 - 153, #2 Exhibit A - complaint pages 154 - 267)(bfa) Modified on 8/15/2019 to correct filing date(bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITY OF ROCKLAND v. PURDUE PHARMA LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC
Represented By: JOSEPH L. CAHOON, JR.
Represented By: LESTER C. HOUTZ
Represented By: ALEX J. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: MELISSA M. HANLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN CO
Represented By: JOSEPH L. CAHOON, JR.
Represented By: LESTER C. HOUTZ
Represented By: ALEX J. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA LP
Represented By: MARK CHEFFO
Represented By: RITCHIE E. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID CORPORATION
Represented By: GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC
Represented By: GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY INC
Represented By: CONOR B. O'CROININ
Represented By: CLIFFORD RUPRECHT
Represented By: GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO
Represented By: MAUREEN M. STURTEVANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEPHALON INC
Represented By: STEVEN A. REED
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF MAINE INC
Represented By: GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Represented By: RYAN ZANE WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Represented By: STEVEN A. REED
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER LOVRIEN
Represented By: DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY
Represented By: SARAH G. CONWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY
Represented By: MARK CHEFFO
Represented By: RITCHIE E. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC
Represented By: DONNA WELCH
Represented By: JENNIFER G. LEVY
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA INC
Represented By: MARK CHEFFO
Represented By: RITCHIE E. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD
Represented By: JOSHUA D. HADIARIS
Represented By: MARK G. LAVOIE
Represented By: MADELEINE K. RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: DAVID R. GEIGER
Represented By: K. NEIL AUSTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES INC
Represented By: STEVEN A. REED
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER D. HAWKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Represented By: RYAN ZANE WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSHUA D. DUNLAP
Represented By: KYLE M. NOONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD
Represented By: JOSHUA D. HADIARIS
Represented By: MARK G. LAVOIE
Represented By: MADELEINE K. RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: DAVID R. GEIGER
Represented By: K. NEIL AUSTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK
Represented By: BRIEN T. O'CONNOR
Represented By: ANDREW J. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL- JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Represented By: STEVEN A. REED
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA INC
Represented By: STEVEN A. REED
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF ROCKLAND
Represented By: ADAM R. LEE
Represented By: JAMES E. BELLEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?