AMES v. AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: GILBERT AMES, JR
Defendant: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00383
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Counsel having advised the Court on 10/9/19 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 11/8/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Stacey L. Graf. (slg)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ERISA SCHEDULING ORDER:Administrative Record due by 10/7/2019. Deadline for filing of Motion for Judgment on the Record for Judicial Review: 11/21/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(SILVER, STEVEN)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re #9 State Court Record, Amended with Corrected Date (SILVER, STEVEN)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summary Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cover Letter encl. Complaint and Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Proof of Service)(SILVER, STEVEN)
August 27, 2019 Reset Deadlines pursuant to the Order entered on 8/27/2019: State Court Record due by 9/3/2019. (lrc)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting without objection #7 Motion to Extend Time. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File State Court Record by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 9/17/2019. (SILVER, STEVEN)
August 22, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for Aetna Life Insruance Company pursuant to the Order entered this date: Answer due by 9/9/2019. (lrc)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting without objection #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Aetna shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by September 9, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (SILVER, STEVEN)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re Set/Reset Answer Deadline by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 9/10/2019. (SILVER, STEVEN)
August 20, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2065764.), filed by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DECKER, BYRNE)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 8/27/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
August 20, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/27/2019. (bfa)
August 20, 2019 Set Answer Deadline : Answer due by 8/26/2019. (bfa)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oxford County Superior Court, case number SOP-SC-CV-2019-00049. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 11/18/2019) Fee due by 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 transmittal sheet, #3 summary sheet, #4 summons, #5 notice of filing notice of removal, #6 notice regarding electronic service)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMES v. AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BYRNE J. DECKER
Represented By: STEVEN J. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILBERT AMES, JR
Represented By: ANDREW S. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?