SALVATO v. PORTLAND HOUSING AUTHORITY et al
Plaintiff: LOUIS BRUCE SALVATO
Defendant: MARK B. ADELSON, TREVOR NUGENT, PORTLAND HOUSING AUTHORITY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, PORTLAND HOUSING AUTHORITY and CLAYTON WILLIAMS
Case Number: 2:2019cv00384
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Service by LOUIS BRUCE SALVATO (jwr)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (No PDF document attached. See PDF document #4 ) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jwr)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint filed by LOUIS BRUCE SALVATO Objections to R&R due by 10/2/2019 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jwr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LOUIS BRUCE SALVATO (bfa)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARK B. ADELSON, TREVOR NUGENT, PORTLAND HOUSING AUTHORITY, PORTLAND HOUSING AUTHORITY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, CLAYTON WILLIAMS with Jury Demand, filed by LOUIS BRUCE SALVATO. (Service of Process Deadline 11/18/2019)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALVATO v. PORTLAND HOUSING AUTHORITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK B. ADELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TREVOR NUGENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTLAND HOUSING AUTHORITY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTLAND HOUSING AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAYTON WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIS BRUCE SALVATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?