UNITED STATES GRAND JURY TRIBUNAL THE PEOPLE v. UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES GRAND JURY TRIBUNAL THE PEOPLE
Defendant: US HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, FEDERAL JUDICIARY, US SENATE and UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT
Case Number: 2:2019cv00407
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for attorney's fees shall be filed within the time specified in Local Rule 54.2 of this Court. By DEPUTY CLERK: Teagan Snyder(tcs)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE accepting #5 Report and Recommended Decision By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint, filed by UNITED STATES GRAND JURY TRIBUNAL THE PEOPLE. Objections to R&R due by 10/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT TO THE COMPLAINT filed by UNITED STATES GRAND JURY TRIBUNAL THE PEOPLE re #1 Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
September 6, 2019 Set Deadlines : Pro Se Appearance Form due on 9/20/2019. (bfa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerks Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (bfa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL JUDICIARY, UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT, US HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, US SENATE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by UNITED STATES GRAND JURY TRIBUNAL THE PEOPLE. (Service of Process Deadline 12/5/2019) Fee due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 table of contents, #2 letter to clerk, #3 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES GRAND JURY TRIBUNAL THE PEOPLE v. UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL JUDICIARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US SENATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES GRAND JURY TRIBUNAL THE PEOPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?