HISTORIC BRIDGE FOUNDATION et al v. CHAO et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION IN THE UNITED STATES, HISTORIC BRIDGE FOUNDATION and FRIENDS OF THE FRANK J. WOOD BRIDGE
Defendant: BRUCE VAN NOTE, ELAINE CHAO, NICOLE R NASEN and TODD JORGENSEN
Case Number: 2:2019cv00408
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by BRUCE VAN NOTE Responses due by 11/25/2019. (KNOWLTON, THOMAS)
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA P. WILSON on behalf of ELAINE CHAO, TODD JORGENSEN, NICOLE R NASEN (WILSON, JOSHUA)
October 16, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 11/18/2019 as to NICOLE R NASEN and TODD JORGENSEN. (jwr)
October 15, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Affidavit of Service, for ELAINE CHAO : Answer due by 11/19/2019. (jwr)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service by HISTORIC BRIDGE FOUNDATION, NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION IN THE UNITED STATES, FRIENDS OF THE FRANK J. WOOD BRIDGE. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Elaine Chao, #2 Exhibit Todd Jorgensen, #3 Exhibit Nicole Nasen, #4 Exhibit Bruce Van Note, #5 Exhibit William Barr, #6 Exhibit Civil Process Clerk, #7 Exhibit Aaron Frey)(TURNER, PHELPS)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES A. BILLINGS on behalf of BRUCE VAN NOTE (BILLINGS, JAMES)
September 25, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for BRUCE VAN NOTE : Answer due by 11/8/2019. (jwr)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to November 8, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by BRUCE VAN NOTE Responses due by 10/16/2019. (KNOWLTON, THOMAS)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS A. KNOWLTON on behalf of BRUCE VAN NOTE (KNOWLTON, THOMAS)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties by HISTORIC BRIDGE FOUNDATION (TURNER, PHELPS)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties by NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION IN THE UNITED STATES (TURNER, PHELPS)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties by FRIENDS OF THE FRANK J. WOOD BRIDGE (TURNER, PHELPS)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by FRIENDS OF THE FRANK J. WOOD BRIDGE, HISTORIC BRIDGE FOUNDATION, NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION IN THE UNITED STATES re #4 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice Andrea Ferster - List of Bar Admissions.. (TURNER, PHELPS)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth S. Merritt filed by PHELPS TURNER on behalf of NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION IN THE UNITED STATES (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2076217.) (TURNER, PHELPS)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrea C. Ferster filed by PHELPS TURNER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2076129.) (TURNER, PHELPS)
September 9, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2075188.), filed by FRIENDS OF THE FRANK J. WOOD BRIDGE.(MAHONEY, SEAN)
September 9, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney Andrea C. Ferster, Elizabeth S. Merritt shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 9/16/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (bfa)
September 9, 2019 Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 9/16/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (bfa)
September 9, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/16/2019. (bfa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ELAINE CHAO, TODD JORGENSEN, NICOLE R NASEN, BRUCE VAN NOTE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Nicole R. Nasen summons, #2 Todd Jorgensen summons, #3 Bruce Van Note summons)(bfa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELAINE CHAO, TODD JORGENSEN, NICOLE R NASEN, BRUCE VAN NOTE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by HISTORIC BRIDGE FOUNDATION, NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION IN THE UNITED STATES, FRIENDS OF THE FRANK J. WOOD BRIDGE. (Service of Process Deadline 12/5/2019) Fee due by 9/9/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HISTORIC BRIDGE FOUNDATION et al v. CHAO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE VAN NOTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAINE CHAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLE R NASEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD JORGENSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION IN THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: ELIZABETH S. MERRITT
Represented By: SEAN MAHONEY
Represented By: ANDREA C. FERSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HISTORIC BRIDGE FOUNDATION
Represented By: ELIZABETH S. MERRITT
Represented By: SEAN MAHONEY
Represented By: ANDREA C. FERSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRIENDS OF THE FRANK J. WOOD BRIDGE
Represented By: ELIZABETH S. MERRITT
Represented By: SEAN MAHONEY
Represented By: ANDREA C. FERSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?