IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC v. FORT LAUDERDALE VETERINARY CENTER INC
Plaintiff: IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC
Defendant: FORT LAUDERDALE VETERINARY CENTER INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00411
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for FORT LAUDERDALE VETERINARY CENTER INC : Answer due by 11/14/2019. (akr)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to November 14, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC Responses due by 11/14/2019. (FOUTS, ADRIANNE)
October 11, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for FORT LAUDERDALE VETERINARY CENTER INC : Answer due by 10/24/2019. (akr)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to October 24, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC Responses due by 10/31/2019. (FOUTS, ADRIANNE)
September 26, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for FORT LAUDERDALE VETERINARY CENTER INC : Answer due by 10/10/2019. (akr)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC. FORT LAUDERDALE VETERINARY CENTER INC served on 9/13/2019. (FOUTS, ADRIANNE)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Statement of Interested Parties by IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC. (FOUTS, ADRIANNE)
September 10, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2075824.), filed by IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC.(FOUTS, ADRIANNE)
September 10, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/17/2019. (bfa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FORT LAUDERDALE VETERINARY CENTER INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FORT LAUDERDALE VETERINARY CENTER INC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/9/2019) Fee due by 9/11/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC v. FORT LAUDERDALE VETERINARY CENTER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORT LAUDERDALE VETERINARY CENTER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC
Represented By: ADRIANNE E. FOUTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?