BUSSELL v. C R BARD INC et al
Plaintiff: GARY L BUSSELL
Defendant: C R BARD INC and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00413
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 12/11/2020. Motions due by 12/30/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, C R BARD INC. (POLANSKY, KEVIN)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion by Attorneys C. Lincoln Combs, Robert Boatman, Mark O'Connor, and Paul Stoller to Withdraw as Attorney. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Attorney C. Lincoln Combs, Robert W. Boatman, Mark S. OConnor, and Paul L. Stoller to Withdraw as Attorney by GARY L BUSSELL Responses due by 10/11/2019. (BIGOS, MICHAEL)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion by Attorney Richard North to Withdraw as Attorney. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 19, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney Matthew E. Brown shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 9/26/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jwr)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew E Brown filed by KEVIN P. POLANSKY on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, C R BARD INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2081046.) (POLANSKY, KEVIN)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Attorney Richard B North, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, C R BARD INC Responses due by 10/10/2019. (POLANSKY, KEVIN)
September 19, 2019 **SECOND NOTICE** Counsel shall submit a motion to withdraw or file Pro Hac Vice Certificates and ECF Registration - Reset Deadlines : Attorney C. LINCOLN COMBS, MARK STEPHEN O'CONNOR, PAUL LINCOLN STOLLER, ROBERT W. BOATMAN, RICHARD B. NORTH, JR. shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 9/26/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 9/26/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (jwr)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shannon Leonard Clark filed by MICHAEL THEODORE BIGOS on behalf of GARY L BUSSELL (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2079332.) (BIGOS, MICHAEL)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN P. POLANSKY on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, C R BARD INC (POLANSKY, KEVIN)
September 10, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney C. LINCOLN COMBS, MARK STEPHEN O'CONNOR, PAUL LINCOLN STOLLER, ROBERT W. BOATMAN, SHANNON L. CLARK, RICHARD B. NORTH, JR. shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 9/17/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 9/17/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. Specific Document Deadline (1) due by 9/17/2019 to obtain local counsel. (jwr)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-01094. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 9, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Maine via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
April 18, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-1094-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
April 18, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12864239 filed by Gary L Bussell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUSSELL v. C R BARD INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R BARD INC
Represented By: RICHARD B. NORTH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC
Represented By: RICHARD B. NORTH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY L BUSSELL
Represented By: SHANNON L. CLARK
Represented By: ROBERT W. BOATMAN
Represented By: PAUL LINCOLN STOLLER
Represented By: MARK STEPHEN O'CONNOR
Represented By: C. LINCOLN COMBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?