EASTMAN v. STATE OF MAINE
Petitioner: TY B EASTMAN
Respondent: STATE OF MAINE
Not Yet Classified: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - HABEAS CASES
Case Number: 2:2019cv00416
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by TY B EASTMAN. Objections to R&R due by 11/21/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER/RESPONSE/REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by STATE OF MAINE. Reply due by 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(MACOMBER, DONALD)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ANSWER #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 11/25/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by TY B EASTMAN (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(mnw)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ON PETITIONER'S FILING. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by TY B EASTMAN. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EASTMAN v. STATE OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: DONALD W. MACOMBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TY B EASTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - HABEAS CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?