VIOLETTE v. TURGEON et al
Plaintiff: GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE
Defendant: US PROBATION, KATE PHILLIPS and BRYCE TURGEON
Case Number: 2:2019cv00417
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH A DICLERICO
Referring Judge: ANDREA K JOHNSTONE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE ANDREA K. JOHNSTONE. (lrc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 MAIL (Orders ECF #12 and #13) sent to GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE returned as undeliverable. Reason: Insufficient Address. Resent to GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE, 10402-036 at DEVENS-CAMP, FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 879, AYER, MA 01432. (akr)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER By JUDGE LANDYA B. MCCAFFERTY. (mjlt)
September 24, 2019 Case Assigned to JUDGE JOSEPH A. DICLERICO, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE ANDREA K. JOHNSTONE. (mjlt)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONCURRING ORDER By JUDGE LANDYA B. MCCAFFERTY. (mjlt)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (mjlt)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jwr)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL.. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (jwr)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (jwr)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jwr)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (jwr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE (jwr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE (jwr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KATE PHILLIPS, BRYCE TURGEON, US PROBATION with Jury Demand, filed by GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE. (Service of Process Deadline 12/10/2019) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VIOLETTE v. TURGEON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US PROBATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATE PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYCE TURGEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?