WELDON v. BUTTS
Plaintiff: JOSHUA PATRICK WELDON
Defendant: STEVE BUTTS
Case Number: 2:2019cv00428
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint filed by JOSHUA PATRICK WELDON, #3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Objections to R&R due by 11/29/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/4/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 20, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Filing Fee or Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due by 10/11/2019. (MFS)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING FILING FEE to pay filing fee or file application to proceed in forma pauperis by 10/11/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STEVE BUTTS, filed by JOSHUA PATRICK WELDON. (Service of Process Deadline 12/16/2019) (Attachments: #1 inmate grievance form, #2 inmate grievance form, #3 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WELDON v. BUTTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE BUTTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA PATRICK WELDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?