MITCHELL v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Plaintiff: REATA MITCHELL
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00433
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by REATA MITCHELL. (DAVIS, ANDREW)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by the Defendant and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Counsel having advised the Court on October 28, 2019 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 11/27/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK:Michelle Thibodeau. (mjlt)
September 25, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA : Answer due by 10/30/2019. (jwr)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to October 30, 2019 By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 2 - Cover letter filing Complaint, #3 3 - Complaint, #4 4 - Summons, #5 5 - Summary Sheet, #6 6 - Cover letter encl. executed Summons, #7 7 - Executed Summons, #8 8 - Cover letter encl. Notice of Filing, #9 9 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #10 10 - Notice of Removal)(SILVER, STEVEN)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA Responses due by 10/16/2019. (SILVER, STEVEN) Modified on 9/25/2019 to remove link to setting deadline (jwr).
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by BYRNE J. DECKER on behalf of LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA (DECKER, BYRNE)
September 24, 2019 Filing Fee Received from LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 219001635. Method of Payment: check. Purpose of Payment: Civil filing fee. Date Paid: 9/24/2019 re #1 Notice of Removal. (bfa)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (SILVER, STEVEN)
September 24, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA: Answer due by 9/30/2019. (slg)
September 24, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA by 10/1/2019. (slg)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 9/30/2019. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (slg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number POR-SC-CV-2019-00348. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.. (Service of Process Deadline 12/23/2019) Fee due by 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Notice of Filing and Notice of Removal, #4 Service Documents, #5 Summary Sheet)(slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MITCHELL v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: STEVEN J. SILVER
Represented By: BYRNE J. DECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REATA MITCHELL
Represented By: ANDREW S. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?