SHIELDS v. UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: LORNA SHIELDS
Defendant: UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00448
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY per Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed this date: Answer due by 12/6/2019. (lrc)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 10/7/2019. (TAINTOR, CHRISTOPHER)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER granting 4 Motion to Seal. Exhibit 3 to the plaintiff's complaint, ECF No. 1-3, is sealed as it contains personal identifier information; the plaintiff has filed a public, redacted version of the same as ECF No. 5. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Seal. Exhibit 3 to the plaintiff's complaint, ECF No. 1-3, is sealed as it contains personal identifier information; the plaintiff shall file a public, redacted version of the same within 10 days or by October 17, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 REDACTED Document re #1 Complaint,,, by LORNA SHIELDS. (TAINTOR, CHRISTOPHER)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal Exhibit 3 to Plaintiff's Complaint by LORNA SHIELDS Responses due by 10/25/2019. (TAINTOR, CHRISTOPHER)
October 4, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2089119.), filed by LORNA SHIELDS.(TAINTOR, CHRISTOPHER)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by LORNA SHIELDS. (Service of Process Deadline 1/2/2020) Fee due by 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Group Voluntary Term Life Insurance Policy - Duramax, #2 Exhibit 2 - Master Group Policy to Duramax Marine, LLC, #3 Exhibit 3 - Salaried Election Form, #4 Exhibit 4 - Census Form, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email Chain, #6 Exhibit 6 - Census Form - 2014, #7 Exhibit 7 - Email Chain, #8 Exhibit 8 - Census Form - 2016, #9 Exhibit 9 - Email Chain, #10 Exhibit 10 - UO Denial 7-16-18, #11 Exhibit 11 - Uphold of Denial Decision - 10-4-18)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHIELDS v. UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORNA SHIELDS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAINTOR
Represented By: TREVOR D. SAVAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?