ROBERTSON v. BARBER FOODS LLC et al
Plaintiff: BRIAN ROBERTSON
Defendant: TYSON FOODS INC, BARBER FOODS LLC and SCOTT SCHMITZ
Case Number: 2:2019cv00455
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BARBER FOODS LLC, SCOTT SCHMITZ, TYSON FOODS INC. (DECKER, BYRNE)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BRIAN ROBERTSON. Reply due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit Right to Sue)(MORRIS, SALLY)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion by Attorney Jillian O'Brien to Withdraw as Attorney. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Attorney Jillian R. O'Brien to Withdraw as Attorney by BARBER FOODS LLC, SCOTT SCHMITZ, TYSON FOODS INC Responses due by 11/22/2019. (DECKER, BYRNE)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by All Defendants (DECKER, BYRNE)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BARBER FOODS LLC, SCOTT SCHMITZ, TYSON FOODS INC Responses due by 11/5/2019. (O'BRIEN, JILLIAN)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by BARBER FOODS LLC, SCOTT SCHMITZ, TYSON FOODS INC. (Attachments: #1 1 - Certified Docket Sheet, #2 2 - Cover Letter enclosing Complaint, #3 3 - Complaint, #4 4 - Complaint Summary Sheet, #5 5 - Cover Letter enclosing return of service, #6 6 - Return of Service Tyson, #7 7 - Return of Service Barber Foods, #8 8 - Cover Letter enclosing return of service Schmitz, #9 9 - Return of Service Schmitz, #10 10 - Cover letter enclosing Notice of Filing, #11 11 - Notice of Filing, #12 12 - Notice of Removal w/ exhibits, #13 13 - Civil Cover Sheet)(O'BRIEN, JILLIAN)
October 8, 2019 Filing Fee Received from BARBER FOODS LLC, SCOTT SCHMITZ, TYSON FOODS INC: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 0100-2090672. Method of Payment: credit card. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 10/8/2019 re #1 Notice of Removal. (bfa)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BARBER FOODS LLC, TYSON FOODS INC. (O'BRIEN, JILLIAN)
October 8, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/15/2019. (bfa)
October 8, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for BARBER FOODS LLC, TYSON FOODS INC, SCOTT SCHMITZ : Answer due by 10/15/2019. (bfa)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 10/15/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-2019-00364. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BARBER FOODS LLC, SCOTT SCHMITZ, TYSON FOODS INC. (Service of Process Deadline 1/6/2020) Fee due by 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Service Docs, #3 Exhibit C Declaration of Lisa Barnett, #4 Exhibit D Notice of Filing)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBERTSON v. BARBER FOODS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN ROBERTSON
Represented By: SALLY A. MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYSON FOODS INC
Represented By: JILLIAN R. O'BRIEN
Represented By: BYRNE J. DECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBER FOODS LLC
Represented By: JILLIAN R. O'BRIEN
Represented By: BYRNE J. DECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT SCHMITZ
Represented By: JILLIAN R. O'BRIEN
Represented By: BYRNE J. DECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?